This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2022 at 20:08:54 (UTC).

Mackey v. Ahmed et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2021 Mackey filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ahmed. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01490

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marisla Mackey

Marissla Mackey

Defendants

Faisal Ahmed

Kimberly Schneider

Paul Kelly

Betty Ulmer

Ashley Knebel

Unknown Prison Officials

Federal Correctional Institution Greenville

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Devlin Joseph Schoop

Attorney at Henderson Parks, LLC

140 South Dearborn, Suite 1020

Chicago, IL 60602

Kimberly Nickelson Tarver

Attorney at Henderson Parks

140 South Dearborn Street, Suite 1020

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorney

Suzanne M. Garrison

Attorney at Assistant U.S. Attorney - Fairview Heights

9 Executive Drive, Suite 300

Fairview Heights, IL 62208

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Exhibit Bond County Case History

21 #21

Main Document

20 #2

Exhibit Exhibit

20 #1

Supplement Attachment

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Faisal Ahmed, Paul Kelly, Ashley Knebel, Kimberly Schneider. (Garrison, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

18 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Faisal Ahmed, Paul Kelly, Ashley Knebel, Kimberly Schneider (Garrison, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Devlin Joseph Schoop on behalf of Marissla Mackey (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 11/29/2021. Consent due by 12/20/2021 (kare) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet in 3:21-cv-01490 Mackey v. Ahmed

1 #4

Exhibit May 24, 2021 Order of Appointment of Marisla Mackey as the Independent A

1 #3

Exhibit August 11, 2021 letter from the United States Department of Justice deny

1 #2

Exhibit Proof of Delivery to the Bureau of Prisons

1 #1

Exhibit Notice of Plaintiff's Claims to the Federal Bureau of Prisons

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Faisal Ahmed, Paul Kelly, Ashley Knebel, Kimberly Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bond County Case History)(Garrison, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Marissla Mackey. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit)(Tarver, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Faisal Ahmed, Paul Kelly, Ashley Knebel, Kimberly Schneider. (Garrison, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by Faisal Ahmed, Paul Kelly, Ashley Knebel, Kimberly Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration)(Garrison, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Faisal Ahmed, Paul Kelly, Ashley Knebel, Kimberly Schneider (Garrison, Suzanne) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Civil Process Clerk for the U.S. Attorney's Office on March 10, 2022 by Marissla Mackey. Waiver of Service due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tarver, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on March 7, 2022 by Marissla Mackey. Waiver of Service due by 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Tarver, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #12 Notice (Other) filed by Marissla Mackey, #13 Notice (Other) filed by Marissla Mackey. Documents 12 and 13 are documents that should not be filed in this Court. See Rule 26.1(b)Filing of Disclosure and Discovery. Interrogatories under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33 and the answers thereto, requests for production or inspection under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34, and depositions under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 30 and 31 shall be served upon other counsel or parties but shall not be filed with the court. This includes notice of service of discovery documents. The party responsible for service of the discovery material shall retain the original and become the custodian thereof.(kls3) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STRICKEN. NOTICE by Marissla Mackey Certificate of Service for Issuance of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit and Waivers of Summons to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tarver, Kimberly) Modified on 3/11/2022 (kls3). (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STRICKEN. NOTICE by Marissla Mackey Certificate of Service for Issuance of Notice of Lawsuit and Waivers of Summons to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Tarver, Kimberly) Modified on 3/11/2022 (kls3). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Process by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tarver, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Nickelson Tarver on behalf of Marissla Mackey (Tarver, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned Chief District Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Marissla Mackey. Plaintiff, as Independent Administrator for the Estate of Tige Cottrell Mackey, filed this Complaint alleging deliberate indifference and negligence while Tige Mackey was at Federal Correctional Institution Greenville. Plaintiff is represented by counsel and submitted the full filing fee. The Complaint does not require a merits review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Plaintiff is responsible for effecting service on the named Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/29/2021. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Devlin Joseph Schoop on behalf of Marissla Mackey (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ACTION See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Schoop does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kare) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 11/29/2021. Consent due by 12/20/2021 (kare) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 21-1490-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kare) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4641814.), filed by Marisla Mackey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Plaintiff's Claims to the Federal Bureau of Prisons, #2 Exhibit Proof of Delivery to the Bureau of Prisons, #3 Exhibit August 11, 2021 letter from the United States Department of Justice denying Plaintiff's claim (Final Denial of Claim), #4 Exhibit May 24, 2021 Order of Appointment of Marisla Mackey as the Independent Administrator for the Decedent's Estate of Tige Cottrell Mackey, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet in 3:21-cv-01490 Mackey v. Ahmed)(Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Suzanne M. Garrison