This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 11:32:06 (UTC).

Mackel v. Pennock et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Mackel filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Pennock. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04026

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Mackel

Rushville, IL 62681

Defendants

Heather Hymes

Jeremie Seymour

Paula Lodge

Schuyler County Sheriff's Office

. Parsons

. Fletcher

Eric Kunkle

. Whittaker

James McCurry

Marie Durrant

. Cleavinger

Javier Perez

Wanda Pennock

Bill Redshaw

Diana Dobier

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Motion for Merit Review by Plaintiff David Mackel. Responses due by 4/29/2021. (BMG) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by David Mackel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS) Modified on 3/22/2021 to correct title. (KE). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff David Mackel. Responses due by 3/5/2021 (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Mackel. Responses due by 3/5/2021 (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Mackel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion for Merit Review by Plaintiff David Mackel. Responses due by 4/29/2021. (BMG) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPrisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 3/31/2021, in the amount of $92.60; receipt number 24626009945. (BMG) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 3/22/2021. This Court has instituted a reduced filing fee procedure for indigent plaintiffs who are institutionalized but who are not prisoners as defined in 28 USC Section 1915(h). A reduced payment will be assessed of 50% of such plaintiff's average monthly income for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint (not to exceed the $402 filing fee). Income includes all deposits from any source. Plaintiff David Mackel is currently detained at Rushville Treatment and Detention Facility, and is thus subject to the reduced payment procedure. Plaintiff's ledgers for the past six months show an average monthly income of $185.21. Plaintiff is ordered to send an institutional check or money order in the amount of $92.60, payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court within 30 days from the date of this order. The reduced fee may be waived if the plaintiff, within 14 days of this order, files a motion to waive the fee and demonstrates good cause for such waiver. (KE) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by David Mackel. (DS) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by David Mackel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DS) Modified on 3/22/2021 to correct title. (KE). (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff David Mackel. Responses due by 3/5/2021 (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Mackel. Responses due by 3/5/2021 (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Mackel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schuyler County Sheriff is a litigant

Latest cases where WHITTAKER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Paula Lodge is a litigant

Latest cases where Fletcher As Trustee Of The Terrence D Fletcher Irrevocable Trust, Sheila is a litigant