This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:28:45 (UTC).

MACK v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 MACK filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17075

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KWASI MACK

Inez, KY 41224

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

OSMAR JOSE BENVENUTO

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07102

RICHARD J. RAMSAY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, 7Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

JOHN GAY

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

BARRY ANTOINE KAMAR

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this Order, Petitioner shall either notify the Court in writing that he intends to have his pending 2255 Motion (ECF No. 2) considered as his all-inclusive 2255 motion, or submit an amended 2255 motion, which includes all available federal claims. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/2/2019. (vm ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

2 #2

Envelope

2 #1

2255 Form

#2

(#2) 28 USC 2255 MEMORANDUM OF FACT AND LAW. (Attachments: #1 2255 Form, #2 Envelope)(vm ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 14-220, filed by KWASI MACK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this Order, Petitioner shall either notify the Court in writing that he intends to have his pending 2255 Motion (ECF No. 2) considered as his all-inclusive 2255 motion, or submit an amended 2255 motion, which includes all available federal claims. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/2/2019. (vm ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) 28 USC 2255 MEMORANDUM OF FACT AND LAW. (Attachments: #1 2255 Form, #2 Envelope)(vm ) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 14-220, filed by KWASI MACK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.