This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2020 at 12:17:58 (UTC).

Grant v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 Grant filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are J Michelle Childs and Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02278

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

J Michelle Childs

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

Nathaniel Mack

Nathaniel Grant

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

Lowe's Home Centers LLC

Beamer's Piggyback Sales & Service

Alice Grant

XPO Logistics LLC

Norman Smith

Michael Hamilton

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

XPO Logistics, LLC

Cross Claimant, Defendant and Counter Claimant

Alice Grant

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Lowe's Home Centers LLC

Beamer's Piggyback Sales & Service

Norman Smith

Michael Hamilton

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerrod A Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Law Office

155 Wall Street

Orangeburg, SC 29116

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Victoria Leigh Anderson

Attorney at Young Clement Rivers

Po Box 993

Charleston, SC 29402

Brandt Robert Horton

Attorney at Young Clement Rivers

Po Box 993

Charleston, SC 29402

Duke Raleigh Highfield

Attorney at Young Clement Rivers and Tisdale

Po Box 993

Charleston, SC 29402

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

William H Yarborough, Jr

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Richard Edward McLawhorn, Jr

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

115 Cargill Way, Suite B

Hartsville, SC 29550

David Christopher Marshall

Attorney at Lanier and Burroughs LLC

Po Drawer 2789

Orangeburg, SC 29116

Shane Morris Burroughs

Attorney at Lanier and Burroughs LLC

Po Drawer 2789

Orangeburg, SC 29116

T David Rheney

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1200

Greenville, SC 29601

William T Young, III

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1200

Greenville, SC 29601

Matthew Keith Harrison

Attorney at Young Clement Rivers, LLP

25 Calhoun Street, Suite 400

Charleston, SC 29401

Counter Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey Michael Crudup

Attorney at Clarkson Walsh and Coulter PA

Po Box 2219

Mount Pleasant, SC 29465

 

Court Documents

#59

#58

#57

#56

49 #1

Memo in Support

#49

44 #2

Exhibit 1 - Beamer's Responses to Requests to Admit

44 #1

Memo in Support

#44

#9

#8

#7

#4

#6

#5

#2

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response filed by Alice Grant.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/20/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Marshall, David) Modified to edit text on 8/13/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Nathaniel Grant.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/20/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Anderson, Jerrod) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Response filed by Alice Grant.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/19/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Marshall, David) Modified to edit text on 8/13/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Response filed by Nathaniel Grant.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/19/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lowes XPO Annual Vehicle Inspection Report)(Anderson, Jerrod) Modified to add description to attachment on 8/13/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE OF JOINDER re #54 Reply to Response to Motion by Alice Grant (Marshall, David) Modified to edit text on 8/5/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Nathaniel Grant. (Anderson, Jerrod) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 48, 50. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #52 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 7/30/2020. Response due date modified to that of original filing: 8/6/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 47. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #49 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 7/30/2020. Response due date modified to that of original filing: 8/13/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Highfield, Duke) Modified to correct filing and reply dates on 8/3/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Highfield, Duke) Modified to correct filing and response due dates on 8/3/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Highfield, Duke) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Orangeburg County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(Rheney, T) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Beamer's Piggyback Sales & Service, Norman Smith.(McLawhorn, Richard) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/9/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/18/2020. (asni, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/8/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/22/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 7/22/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/1/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/1/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/2/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/2/2020, Discovery due by 12/2/2020, Motions due by 12/16/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/5/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 4/6/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/18/2020. (asni, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by XPO Logistics LLC.(Rheney, T) Modified to link correct event to associated event on 7/8/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nathaniel Mack. (Originally filed in state court on 6/16/2020)(asni, ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Nathaniel Mack, CROSSCLAIM against Beamer's Piggyback Sales & Service, Michael Hamilton, Lowe's Home Centers LLC, Norman Smith by Alice Grant. (originally filed in state court on 6/21/2019)(asni, ) Modified to edit text on 6/17/2020 (asni, ). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by XPO Logistics LLC.(asni, ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orangeburg County, case number 2019-CP-38-00789. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9161044), filed by XPO Logistics LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(asni, ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XPO Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant