This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2020 at 08:04:02 (UTC).

Mack v. Comprehensive Health Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Mack filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Comprehensive Health Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malcolm Mack

Defendants

Comprehensive Health Management, Inc.

WellCare Health Insurance of Arizona, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rodney Parry Bridgers, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Rodney Bridgers, LLLC

707 Richards Street, Suite 526

Honolulu, HI 96813

David F. Simons

Attorney at The Law Offices of David F. Simons

707 Richards St Ste Ph1, 536-3255

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

5 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/4/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Comprehensive Health Management, Inc., WellCare Health Insurance of Arizona, Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #2

Main Document Summoons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial against Comprehensive Health Management, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.0975-2342842), filed by Malcolm Mack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Main Document Summoons)(Bridgers, Rodney) Modified on 3/4/2020 to add receipt number (emt, ). (Entered: 03/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#6) EO: Counsel Rodney Parry Bridgers, Jr. informs the Court that the parties have been served with waiver of service, approximately 2 weeks ago, allowing the parties to answer in 30 days. To allow sufficient time for the parties to answer and to hold their meet and confer, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 05/04/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 06/15/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 06/08/2020. Mr. Bridgers to notify the parties. Pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's April 16, 2020 Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb, ) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/4/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Comprehensive Health Management, Inc., WellCare Health Insurance of Arizona, Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00101 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial against Comprehensive Health Management, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.0975-2342842), filed by Malcolm Mack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Main Document Summoons)(Bridgers, Rodney) Modified on 3/4/2020 to add receipt number (emt, ). (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH MANAGMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David F. Simons(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodney P. Bridgers, Jr.