This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 07:44:01 (UTC).

Mack v. Adesa, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Mack filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Adesa, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01148

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerome Mack

Defendants

Adesa, Inc.

ADESA Illinois, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cameron Joseph Tober

Attorney at O'connor Law Firm, Ltd.

19 S. Lasalle, Ste. 1400

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas A Caputo

Attorney at Caputo & Popovic, P.C.

739 S. Western Avenue, Suite 1

Chicago, IL 60612

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2022-L-000491) filed by ADESA Illinois, LLC, Adesa, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19214291. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Removal)(Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ADESA Illinois, LLC, Adesa, Inc. by Nicholas A Caputo (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#5

(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to Cameron Joseph Tober (daj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 3/7/2022: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 4/13/2022 at 10:10 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than seven days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#7

(#7) STATUS Report by ADESA Illinois, LLC, Adesa, Inc. (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Before the Court is the Joint Initial Status Report #7 submitted by the parties. Upon review of the Report and the schedule recommended by the parties, the Court finds the schedule to be reasonable and thus adopts the parties' recommendations. Enter separate scheduling order. The parties are cautioned that the fact discovery cutoff date is a governing deadline and that no extensions of this deadline will be granted absent a showing of good cause. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4). The status hearing set for 4/13/2022 is stricken and reset to 8/9/2022 at 09:40 AM. The parties shall use the same call-in information #6 . Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER UNDER RULE 16(b) signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/7/2022. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by ADESA Illinois, LLC, Adesa, Inc.(Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by ADESA Illinois, LLC, Adesa, Inc.(Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER UNDER RULE 16(b) signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/7/2022. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Before the Court is the Joint Initial Status Report #7 submitted by the parties. Upon review of the Report and the schedule recommended by the parties, the Court finds the schedule to be reasonable and thus adopts the parties' recommendations. Enter separate scheduling order. The parties are cautioned that the fact discovery cutoff date is a governing deadline and that no extensions of this deadline will be granted absent a showing of good cause. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4). The status hearing set for 4/13/2022 is stricken and reset to 8/9/2022 at 09:40 AM. The parties shall use the same call-in information #6 . Mailed notice (ef, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS Report by ADESA Illinois, LLC, Adesa, Inc. (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 3/7/2022: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 4/13/2022 at 10:10 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than seven days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to Cameron Joseph Tober (daj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ADESA Illinois, LLC, Adesa, Inc. by Nicholas A Caputo (Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2022-L-000491) filed by ADESA Illinois, LLC, Adesa, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19214291. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Removal)(Caputo, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adesa, Inc. is a litigant