This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2022 at 07:58:33 (UTC).

Mack et al v. MCG Health LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 Mack filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against MCG Health LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ricardo S. Martinez and David W. Christel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00935

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

Referral Judge

David W. Christel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JULIE MACK

JOANNE MULLINS

INGRID COX

Defendant

MCG Health LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin F Johns

Attorney at CHIMICLES SCHWARTZ KRINER & DONALDSON-SMITH LLP

361 W. Lancaster Ave

Haverford, PA 19041

Beth E Terrell

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 N 34Th St, Ste 300

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Jennifer Rust Murray

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 N 34Th St, Ste 300

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Samantha E Holbrook

Attorney at CHIMICLES SCHWARTZ KRINER & DONALDSON-SMITH LLP

361 W. Lancaster Ave

Haverford, PA 19041

Defendant Attorney

Jaime Drozd Allen

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE (SEA)

920 Fifth Ave, Ste 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) MCG Health LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7619217), filed by JOANNE MULLINS, JULIE MACK, INGRID COX. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:22-cv-00894; 2:22-cv-00892; 2:22-cv-00925; 2:22-cv-00849; 2:22-cv-00879; 2:22-cv-00862; 2:22-cv-00870, by Plaintiffs INGRID COX, JULIE MACK, JOANNE MULLINS. (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#3

(#6) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin F Johns for Plaintiffs Ingrid Cox, Julie Mack, and Joanne Mullins by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#4

(#7) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Samantha E Holbrook for Plaintiffs Ingrid Cox, Julie Mack, and Joanne Mullins by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) MCG Health LLC (JWC) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/10/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/17/2022. (LC) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jaime Drozd Allen on behalf of Defendant MCG Health LLC. (Allen, Jaime) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#12

(#12) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendant MCG Health LLC. Noting Date 7/15/2022, (Allen, Jaime) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Absent the filing of a consolidated complaint, MCG shall file its Response by 9/12/2022. If a consolidated complaint is filed, MCG Health shall file its Response the later of 45 days from the filing of the consolidated complaint or 9/12/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on MCG Health, LLC on 7/15/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Ingrid Cox, Julie Mack, Joanne Mullins. (Murray, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#15

(#15) MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to Judge Judge David W. Christel authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. All parties are hereby ORDERED to meet-and-confer in accordance with Local Civil Rule 42(b) and either file a stipulation to consolidate or file a response SHOWING CAUSE why the cases should not be consolidated (without prejudice to later bifurcation, as appropriate) on or before 8/22/2022. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases by parties (Murray, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#18

(#18) STIPULATED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases. The following actions pending in this District shall be consolidated for pre-trial proceedings and trial pursuant to FRCP 42(a): 2:22-cv-00849, 2:22-cv-00862, 2:22-cv-00870, 2:22-cv-00879, 2:22-cv-00892, 2:22-cv-00894, 2:22-cv-00925, 2:22-cv-00935, 2:22-cv-00978. The case file for the Consolidated Action will be maintained under the Master File Case No. 2:22-cv-00849. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases. The following actions pending in this District shall be consolidated for pre-trial proceedings and trial pursuant to FRCP 42(a): 2:22-cv-00849, 2:22-cv-00862, 2:22-cv-00870, 2:22-cv-00879, 2:22-cv-00892, 2:22-cv-00894, 2:22-cv-00925, 2:22-cv-00935, 2:22-cv-00978. The case file for the Consolidated Action will be maintained under the Master File Case No. 2:22-cv-00849. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases by parties (Murray, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. All parties are hereby ORDERED to meet-and-confer in accordance with Local Civil Rule 42(b) and either file a stipulation to consolidate or file a response SHOWING CAUSE why the cases should not be consolidated (without prejudice to later bifurcation, as appropriate) on or before 8/22/2022. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (SB) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to Judge Judge David W. Christel authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on MCG Health, LLC on 7/15/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Ingrid Cox, Julie Mack, Joanne Mullins. (Murray, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Absent the filing of a consolidated complaint, MCG shall file its Response by 9/12/2022. If a consolidated complaint is filed, MCG Health shall file its Response the later of 45 days from the filing of the consolidated complaint or 9/12/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendant MCG Health LLC. Noting Date 7/15/2022, (Allen, Jaime) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jaime Drozd Allen on behalf of Defendant MCG Health LLC. (Allen, Jaime) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/10/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/17/2022. (LC) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Tana Lin. Case Reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Judge Tana Lin no longer assigned to the case. (KMP) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Samantha E Holbrook for Plaintiffs Ingrid Cox, Julie Mack, and Joanne Mullins by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin F Johns for Plaintiffs Ingrid Cox, Julie Mack, and Joanne Mullins by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) MCG Health LLC (JWC) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketJudge Tana Lin added. (JWC) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Samantha E. Holbrook FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs INGRID COX, JULIE MACK, JOANNE MULLINS (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7619773 (Murray, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin F. Johns FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs INGRID COX, JULIE MACK, JOANNE MULLINS (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7619769 (Murray, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:22-cv-00894; 2:22-cv-00892; 2:22-cv-00925; 2:22-cv-00849; 2:22-cv-00879; 2:22-cv-00862; 2:22-cv-00870, by Plaintiffs INGRID COX, JULIE MACK, JOANNE MULLINS. (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) MCG Health LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7619217), filed by JOANNE MULLINS, JULIE MACK, INGRID COX. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCG Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaime Drozd Allen