This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:50:24 (UTC).

MACK et al v. AVERTEST, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 MACK filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against AVERTEST, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD G. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05106

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD G. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JESSICA MACK

JEREMY MACK

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LEHIGH COUNTY

AVERTEST, LLC

LEHIGH COUNTY COURT ADULT PROBATION & PAROLE DEPARTMENT

JOHN DOES 1-10

CHRISTINE DARRAH

AVERTEST, LLC doing business as AVERHEALTH

Defendant and Cross Claimant

AVERTEST, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARY SCHAFKOPF

Attorney at HOPKINS SCHAFKOPF, LLC

11 Bala Ave.

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

MATTHEW B. WEISBERG

Attorney at WEISBERG LAW PC

7 South Morton Ave

Morton, PA 19070

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS M. CAFFREY

Attorney at Thomas M. Caffrey, Esq.

Po Box A

Coplay, PA 18037-0200

MICHAEL R. ABBOTT

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

MARTHA GALE

Attorney at ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF PA COURTS

1515 Market Street, Suite 1414

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

MICHAEL R. ABBOTT

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#17

16 #3

Text of Proposed Order

16 #2

Certificate of Service

16 #1

Brief

#16

15 #2

Certificate of Service

15 #1

Brief

#15

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

10 #2

Certificate of Service

10 #1

Brief

#10

#9

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MAY HAVE UNTIL JANUARY 23, 2020 WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT, DARRAH'S MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 12/23/19. 12/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss filed by AVERTEST, LLC.Brief in Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABBOTT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by CHRISTINE DARRAH(IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY ONLY).Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(CAFFREY, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER OF 12/10/2019 THAT THE DEFENDANT HAVING FILED TWO MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOC. NOS. 3,10); AND THE PLAINTIFFS HAVING RESPONDED TO THESE MOTIONS BY FILING AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 13); ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOC. NOS. 3,10) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE: EDWARD G. SMITH ON 12/10/2019. 12/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AVERTEST, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, CHRISTINE DARRAH, filed by JEREMY MACK, JESSICA MACK.(dt, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) First Amended Complaint by JEREMY MACK, JESSICA MACK. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #13 FOR CORRECT FILING). (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) Modified on 12/9/2019 (fb). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Avertest, LLC d/b/a Averhealth ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against CHRISTINE DARRAH, JOHN DOES 1-10, LEHIGH COUNTY, LEHIGH COUNTY COURT ADULT PROBATION & PAROLE DEPARTMENT by AVERTEST, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ABBOTT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CHRISTINE DARRAH, LEHIGH COUNTY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(CAFFREY, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS M. CAFFREY on behalf of CHRISTINE DARRAH, LEHIGH COUNTY with certificate of service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAFFREY, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL R. ABBOTT on behalf of AVERTEST, LLC with Jury Demand and/or Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ABBOTT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JESSICA MACK re: Tim O'Brien served Summons and Complaint upon AVERTEST, LLC by Sheriff. AVERTEST, LLC served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JESSICA MACK re: Tim O'Brien served Summons and Complaint upon CHRISTINE DARRAH by Sheriff. CHRISTINE DARRAH served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim O'Brien re: served Summons and Complaint upon Lehigh County Court Adult Probation and Parole Dept by Sheriff on 11/14/2019 (SCHAFKOPF, GARY) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JESSICA MACK re: Tim O'Brien served Summons and Complaint upon LEHIGH COUNTY by Sheriff. LEHIGH COUNTY served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • 4 Summons Issued as to AVERTEST, LLC, CHRISTINE DARRAH, LEHIGH COUNTY, LEHIGH COUNTY COURT ADULT PROBATION & PAROLE DEPARTMENT. Forwarded To: counsel on 11/22/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by CHRISTINE DARRAH, LEHIGH COUNTY COURT ADULT PROBATION & PAROLE DEPARTMENT.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(GALE, MARTHA) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW B. WEISBERG on behalf of JEREMY MACK, JESSICA MACK with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JEREMY MACK, JESSICA MACK. (bw, ) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AVERTEST, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, LEHIGH COUNTY, LEHIGH COUNTY COURT ADULT PROBATION & PAROLE DEPARTMENT, and CHRISTINE DARRAH. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206077.), filed by JESSICA MACK, JEREMY MACK.(bw, ) Modified on 11/22/2019 (md). (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEHIGH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Avertest, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARY SCHAFKOPF

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW B. WEISBERG