This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2022 at 08:45:48 (UTC).

MACHION v. AIRGAS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 MACHION filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AIRGAS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02611

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIAN MACHION

Defendant

AIRGAS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

DANIEL H. AIKEN

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, 18Th & Cherry Sts.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to AIRGAS, INC.. (rf, ) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN MACHION. AIRGAS, INC. waiver sent on 7/6/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. AIKEN on behalf of AIRGAS, INC. with Certificate of Service(AIKEN, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR on behalf of AIRGAS, INC. with Certificate of Service(RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR on behalf of AIRGAS, INC. with Certificate of Service(RAZOR, MORGAN) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL H. AIKEN on behalf of AIRGAS, INC. with Certificate of Service(AIKEN, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN MACHION. AIRGAS, INC. waiver sent on 7/6/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to AIRGAS, INC.. (rf, ) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AIRGAS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16023906.), filed by BRIAN MACHION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIRGAS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel H. Aiken

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORGAN BROOKE RAZOR