This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2020 at 20:51:57 (UTC).

Mace v. Berje, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 Mace filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Berje, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05044

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marlene Mace

Defendants

Elan Chemical Company, Inc.

Kerry, Inc.

Penta Manufacturing Co., Inc.

Fona International, Inc.

Gamay Foods, Inc.

DSM Food Specialties USA, Inc.

Frutarom USA, Inc.

O'Laughlin Industries, Inc.

Sigma-Aldrich, Inc.

Centrome, Inc.

The Edlong Corporation

Berje, Inc.

Phoenix Aromas & Essential Oils, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Richardson Burcham, Iii

Attorney at Tom R. Burcham, Iii, Llc

222 W. Columbia St.

Farmington, MO 63640

Defendant Attorneys

Karen Minkoff Borg

Attorney at Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60654

Albert Edwin Fowerbaugh, Jr.

Attorney at Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60654

Daniel Arik Waitzman

Attorney at Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.

70 West Madison St., Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60602

Moira H. Pietrowski

Attorney at Roetzel & Andress

222 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

William Benjamin Kalbac

Attorney at Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.

Three First National Plaza, 70 W. Madison St., Suite#4000

Chicago, IL 60602

Dawn Marie Canty

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Scott Dwight Pfeiffer

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & VanAusdal LLC

303 West Madison, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606-3315

Zachary Gordon Shook

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & Vanausdal Llc

303 West Madison, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel K. Cray

Attorney at Cray Huber Horstman Heil & VanAusdal LLC

303 West Madison Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of South Carolina the electronic record. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#66

(#66) ORDER written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/6/2019. Defendant Kerry, Inc.'s motion to dismiss #49 is granted. This case is transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Defendant Elan Chemical's motion to dismiss #59 is denied without prejudice to renewal in the District of South Carolina. The Clerk is directed to effectuate the transfer forthwith. The 12/9/2019 status hearing #62 is stricken. Civil case transferred.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#65

(#65) NOTICE by Kristin C Foster of Change of Address or Name (Foster, Kristin) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#64

(#64) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marlene Mace by Bartholomew J Galvin (Galvin, Bartholomew) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#63

(#63) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marlene Mace by Daniel Emmett O'Brien (O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#62

(#62) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/9/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Motion hearing held. Motions to dismiss and/or transfer #49 #59 are entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motions by 11/20/2019; movants shall reply by 12/4/2019. Any non-movant wishing to join either or both of those motions shall file their joinders by 11/14/2019. MIDP disclosures are stayed pending further order of court. Plaintiff has until 12/6/2019 to comply with Local Rule 83.15; if Plaintiff failed to comply, Plaintiff's pleadings will be stricken and the case will be dismissed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#61

(#61) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Elan Chemical Company, Inc. (Drain, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#59

(#59) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Elan Chemical Company, Inc. (Drain, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#49

(#62) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/9/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Motion hearing held. Motions to dismiss and/or transfer #49 #59 are entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motions by 11/20/2019; movants shall reply by 12/4/2019. Any non-movant wishing to join either or both of those motions shall file their joinders by 11/14/2019. MIDP disclosures are stayed pending further order of court. Plaintiff has until 12/6/2019 to comply with Local Rule 83.15; if Plaintiff failed to comply, Plaintiff's pleadings will be stricken and the case will be dismissed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marlene Mace by Thomas Richardson Burcham, Iii (Burcham, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fona International, Inc. by Moira H. Pietrowski (Pietrowski, Moira) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fona International, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#5

(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sxb, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fona International, Inc. by Daniel Arik Waitzman (Waitzman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Waitzman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019L007956) filed by Fona International, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16073870. Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Waitzman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the District of South Carolina as case 4:19-cv-03438, filed 12/09/2019. (kp, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of South Carolina the electronic record. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ORDER written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/6/2019. Defendant Kerry, Inc.'s motion to dismiss #49 is granted. This case is transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Defendant Elan Chemical's motion to dismiss #59 is denied without prejudice to renewal in the District of South Carolina. The Clerk is directed to effectuate the transfer forthwith. The 12/9/2019 status hearing #62 is stricken. Civil case transferred.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE by Kristin C Foster of Change of Address or Name (Foster, Kristin) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marlene Mace by Bartholomew J Galvin (Galvin, Bartholomew) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marlene Mace by Daniel Emmett O'Brien (O'Brien, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 12/9/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Motion hearing held. Motions to dismiss and/or transfer #49 #59 are entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motions by 11/20/2019; movants shall reply by 12/4/2019. Any non-movant wishing to join either or both of those motions shall file their joinders by 11/14/2019. MIDP disclosures are stayed pending further order of court. Plaintiff has until 12/6/2019 to comply with Local Rule 83.15; if Plaintiff failed to comply, Plaintiff's pleadings will be stricken and the case will be dismissed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Elan Chemical Company, Inc. (Drain, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Motion by Kurt Brendan Drain for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #59 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Drain, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Elan Chemical Company, Inc. (Drain, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marlene Mace by Thomas Richardson Burcham, Iii (Burcham, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fona International, Inc. by Moira H. Pietrowski (Pietrowski, Moira) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fona International, Inc. by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sxb, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fona International, Inc. by Daniel Arik Waitzman (Waitzman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Waitzman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019L007956) filed by Fona International, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16073870. Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Waitzman, Daniel) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Frutarom USA Inc. is a litigant