This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 07:25:52 (UTC).

MacDonald et al v. Servis One, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 MacDonald filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Servis One, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06070

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tammy MacDonald

Jeffrey MacDonald

Defendants

Statebridge Company, LLC

Trans Union LLC

Servis One, Inc. doing business as BSI Financial Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie R Tatar

Attorney at Tatar Law Firm, APC

3333 Warrenville Road, Suite 200

Lisle, IL 60532

Steven J. Uhrich

Attorney at Uhrich Law, P.C.

1010 Lake Street, Ste. 200

Oak Park, IL 60301

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Scott Iaria

Attorney at Diaz Anselmo & Associates, LLC

1771 W. Diehl #120

Naperville, IL 60563

Laura K. Rang

Attorney at Trans Union, LLC

555 W. Adams Street

Chicago, IL 60661

Scott Edwin Brady

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.c.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tammy MacDonald, Jeffrey MacDonald; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18868323.(Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jeffrey MacDonald, Tammy MacDonald by Steven J. Uhrich (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Servis One, Inc. D.B.A. BSI Financial Services; Statebridge Company, LLC; Trans Union LLC on 11/16/2021 by Plaintiffs Jeffrey MacDonald, Tammy MacDonald. Waiver of service due by 12/16/2021. (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jeffrey MacDonald, Tammy MacDonald by Stephanie R Tatar (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Trans Union LLC by Scott Edwin Brady (Brady, Scott) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Trans Union LLC by Laura K. Rang (Rang, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tammy MacDonald, Jeffrey MacDonald. Servis One, Inc. waiver sent on 12/9/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Statebridge Company, LLC by Christopher Scott Iaria (Iaria, Christopher) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tammy MacDonald, Jeffrey MacDonald. Trans Union LLC waiver sent on 11/16/2021, answer due 1/17/2022. (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Steven J. Uhrich of Change of Address (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 2/15/2022 at 10:30 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 2/15/2022 at 10:30 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Steven J. Uhrich of Change of Address (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tammy MacDonald, Jeffrey MacDonald. Trans Union LLC waiver sent on 11/16/2021, answer due 1/17/2022. (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Statebridge Company, LLC by Christopher Scott Iaria (Iaria, Christopher) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tammy MacDonald, Jeffrey MacDonald. Servis One, Inc. waiver sent on 12/9/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Trans Union LLC by Laura K. Rang (Rang, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Trans Union LLC by Scott Edwin Brady (Brady, Scott) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jeffrey MacDonald, Tammy MacDonald by Stephanie R Tatar (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Servis One, Inc. D.B.A. BSI Financial Services; Statebridge Company, LLC; Trans Union LLC on 11/16/2021 by Plaintiffs Jeffrey MacDonald, Tammy MacDonald. Waiver of service due by 12/16/2021. (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jeffrey MacDonald, Tammy MacDonald by Steven J. Uhrich (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tammy MacDonald, Jeffrey MacDonald; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18868323.(Uhrich, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Service One Inc. doing business as BSI Financial Services is a litigant

Latest cases where STATEBRIDGE COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher S. Iaria