This case was last updated from PACER on 03/22/2021 at 08:58:48 (UTC).

Mabe v. Credit Bureau Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Mabe filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Amy Totenberg and Linda T. Walker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

Referral Judge

Linda T. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Mabe

Defendant

Credit Bureau Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Christopher Neil Armor

Attorney at Armor Law, LLC

P.O. Box 451328

Atlanta, GA 31145

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right of any party, anytime within the next sixty (60) days, to reopen this action or vacate this order of dismissal. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order of dismissal and to reopen the action, if necessary. If the action has not been reopened or the Court has not received a motion to vacate on or before the time permitted by this Order, the action will be dismissed with prejudice re #6 Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/11/21. (rlb) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Settlement Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. by Donna Mabe (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#5

(#5) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Donna Mabe. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#2

(#2) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Donna Mabe. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10629836) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker terminated from case. (rlb) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right of any party, anytime within the next sixty (60) days, to reopen this action or vacate this order of dismissal. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order of dismissal and to reopen the action, if necessary. If the action has not been reopened or the Court has not received a motion to vacate on or before the time permitted by this Order, the action will be dismissed with prejudice re #6 Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/11/21. (rlb) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Settlement Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. by Donna Mabe (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Donna Mabe. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Donna Mabe. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10629836) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Neil Armor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Berry