This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2020 at 08:39:50 (UTC).

Maaco Franchisor SPV, LLC v. Sadwick, et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Maaco Franchisor SPV, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Sadwick,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Graham Mullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maaco Franchisor SPV, LLC

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Gregg A. Sadwick

Greba Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Earl Shook

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Richard William Farrell

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

6 #2

Exhibit Proof of Service

6 #1

Exhibit UPS Delivery Notification

#6

5 #1

Summons - Greba Corp.

#5

#4

3 #1

Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion

#3

1 #3

Exhibit Notice of Termination

1 #2

Exhibit Assignment Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit Franchise Agreement

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/24/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Exhibit by Gregg A. Sadwick. Exhibit to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Exhibit A - Excerpt from Marketing Section of Franchise Agrmnt. (Farrell, Richard) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Gregg A. Sadwick.(Farrell, Richard) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants.. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on April 9, 2020. (DC) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greba Corporation (Farrell, Richard) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, & Proposed Order by Greba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farrell, Richard) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard William Farrell on behalf of All Defendants (Farrell, Richard) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Maaco Franchisor SPV, LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UPS Delivery Notification, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Shook, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Greba Corporation, Gregg A. Sadwick. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Greba Corp.)(brl) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketMagistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to case. (brl) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2020

DocketCase reassigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr no longer assigned to the case pursuant to conflict with party. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (ctb) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Maaco Franchisor SPV, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Shook, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maaco Franchisor SPV, LLC (Shook, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4415390), filed by Maaco Franchisor SPV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit Assignment Agreement, #3 Exhibit Notice of Termination)(Shook, Benjamin) Modified on 3/11/2020 to remove duplicative text (rth). (Entered: 03/06/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less