This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2020 at 07:08:45 (UTC).

Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC v. Albitouni Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Albitouni Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07757

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

MAACO FRANCHISOR SPV LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

TRICIA KENNEDY

SAM ALBITOUNI

Albitouni Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

C. Douglas Moran

DENNIS DEAN LEONE

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

David R. Sweis

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Certificate of Service Attorney Apperance

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defense, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Tricia Kennedy, Sam Albitouni, Albitouni Inc against All Plaintiffs . by Tricia Kennedy, Sam Albitouni, Albitouni Inc(Sweis, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC's motion for preliminary injunction oral argument requested #5 is entered and continued. Status hearing is set for 1/23/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for extension of time #8 is denied as moot. Defendant's uncontested motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead by 1/17/2020 #9 is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16592852. (LEONE, DENNIS) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Motion by David R. Sweis for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Sweis, David) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sam Albitouni, Albitouni Inc, Tricia Kennedy by David R. Sweis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Attorney Apperance)(Sweis, David) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant Sam Albitouni for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Sweis, David) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Sam Albitouni for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. (Sweis, David) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Motion by C. Douglas Moran for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #5 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/9/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Moran, C. Douglas) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM by Maaco Franchisor SPV LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #5 (Moran, C. Douglas) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff MAACO FRANCHISOR SPV LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Moran, C. Douglas) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants SAM ALBITOUNI, ALBITOUNI INC., TRICIA KENNEDY (ec, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by MAACO FRANCHISOR SPV LLC of Claims Involving Patents or Trademarks (Moran, C. Douglas) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MAACO FRANCHISOR SPV LLC (Moran, C. Douglas) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Moran, C. Douglas) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by MAACO FRANCHISOR SPV LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16473065. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Moran, C. Douglas) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less