This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/21/2021 at 08:42:50 (UTC).

MA & Associates, LLC v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 MA Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01949

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MA & Associates, LLC

Defendants

Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.

Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois

Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast

Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company

Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffery A. Bendavid

Attorney at Bendavid Law

7301 Peak Drive Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Stephanie Smith

Attorney at Bendavid Law

7301 Peak Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Defendant Attorneys

Darren T Brenner

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Andrew B. Downs

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey, et al

101 Montgomery Streetsuite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by MA & Associates, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bendavid, Jeffery) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#13

(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT in Removed Case by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,,,,, filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.(Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,,,,, filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/23/2021.(Downs, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer Complaint (10 days) re #1 Petition for Removal,,,,, by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit 11 (St Ct IAFD)

1 #10

Exhibit 10 (Return of Service)

1 #9

Exhibit 9 (Return of Service)

1 #8

Exhibit 8 (Return of Service)

1 #7

Exhibit 7 (Return of Service)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 (Return of Service)

1 #5

Exhibit 5 (Return of Service)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 (Return of Service)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 (Return of Service)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (St. Ct. First Amended Complaint)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (State Ct. Complaint)

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by MA & Associates, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bendavid, Jeffery) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT in Removed Case by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,,,,, filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.(Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,,,,, filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/23/2021.(Downs, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Stipulation Re: #1 Petition for Removal - Defendants' answers due 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer Complaint (10 days) re #1 Petition for Removal,,,,, by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Denying #6 Stipulation without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,,,,, by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/22/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/6/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal,,,,, by Defendants Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketAttorney update in case due to removing counsel's case opening error: Attorneys Jeffery A. Bendavid and Stephanie Smith for Plaintiff, MA & Associates, LLC added. (DRS) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. added. (Downs, Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-21-835720-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6674239) by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Southeast, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Ct. Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (St. Ct. First Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 (Return of Service), #4 Exhibit 4 (Return of Service), #5 Exhibit 5 (Return of Service), #6 Exhibit 6 (Return of Service), #7 Exhibit 7 (Return of Service), #8 Exhibit 8 (Return of Service), #9 Exhibit 9 (Return of Service), #10 Exhibit 10 (Return of Service), #11 Exhibit 11 (St Ct IAFD), #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Downs, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. is a litigant