This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 09:45:01 (UTC).

M. v. United Healthcare Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 M filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dale A. Kimball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Kimball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. M.

Defendants

United Healthcare Insurance

United Behavioral Health

Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP Health & Welfare Benefits Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. King

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent J. Newton

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samuel Martin Hall

Attorney at BRIAN S KING PC

420 E South Temple Ste 420

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff R. M. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. M. as to United Behavioral Health Waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. M. as to United Healthcare Insurance Waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. M. as to Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP Health & Welfare Benefits Plan Waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. M. as to Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP Health & Welfare Benefits Plan Waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. M. as to United Healthcare Insurance Waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R. M. as to United Behavioral Health Waiver sent on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (King, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Pricewaterhouse Coopers LLP Health & Welfare Benefits Plan, United Behavioral Health, United Healthcare Insurance (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4275965) filed by R. M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (King, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff R. M. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel M. Hall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent J. Newton