This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2021 at 09:17:07 (UTC).

M S International, Inc. v. Venezia Stone, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 M S International, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Venezia Stone, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lydia Kay Griggsby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02422

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lydia Kay Griggsby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

M S International, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Venezia Stone, Inc.

Does 1 Through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Aaron Glikin

Attorney at Bowie and Jensen LLC

210 West Pennsylvania Ave, Suite 400

Towson, MD 21204

Meredith L Williams

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

18575 Jamboree Road

Irvine, CA 92612

Ronald P Oines

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

18575 Jamboree Road

Irvine, CA 92612

Sarah E Gilmartin

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

18575 Jamboree Road

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Michael Arthur Brown

Attorney at Joseph, Greenwald& Laake, P.A.

6404 Ivy Lane, Suite 400

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Harold M Walter

Attorney at Offit Kurman PA

300 E Lombard St

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Arthur Brown on behalf of Venezia Stone, Inc. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 16 Case Management Conference scheduled for Tuesday, December 14, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. in Chambers (telephonic) before Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Pre-conference joint status report due December 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 11/8/2021. (js6, Chambers) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (MSI's Answer to Venezia's Counterclaim) by M S International, Inc..(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#13

(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint And Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against M S International, Inc. by Venezia Stone, Inc..(Walter, Harold) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#12

(#12) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Venezia Stone, Inc. (Walter, Harold) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

8 #1

Attachment

#8

(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ronald P. Oines (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9511053.) by M S International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/23/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meredith L. Williams (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9508782.) by M S International, Inc.(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah E. Gilmartin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9508771.) by M S International, Inc.(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Arthur Brown on behalf of Venezia Stone, Inc. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 16 Case Management Conference scheduled for Tuesday, December 14, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. in Chambers (telephonic) before Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Pre-conference joint status report due December 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 11/8/2021. (js6, Chambers) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (MSI's Answer to Venezia's Counterclaim) by M S International, Inc..(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint And Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against M S International, Inc. by Venezia Stone, Inc..(Walter, Harold) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Venezia Stone, Inc. (Walter, Harold) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ronald P Oines. Directing attorney Ronald P Oines to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Meredith L Williams. Directing attorney Meredith L Williams to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sarah E Gilmartin. Directing attorney Sarah E Gilmartin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ronald P. Oines (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9511053.) by M S International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 9/23/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meredith L. Williams (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9508782.) by M S International, Inc.(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah E. Gilmartin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9508771.) by M S International, Inc.(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint, filed by M S International, Inc. (Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by M S International, Inc. (Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Venezia Stone, Inc..(kos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDeficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 9/29/2021 (kos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDeficiency Notice -- M S International, Inc. Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/29/2021 (kos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Demand by M S International, Inc.(kos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Venezia Stone, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9506115.), filed by M S International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Summons)(Glikin, Joshua) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MS INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harold M Walter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Arthur Brown