This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2023 at 09:02:24 (UTC).

M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc v. Technology Insurance Company Inc

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Technology Insurance Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00640

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc

Defendant

Technology Insurance Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Chamless Lane

Joshua David Gordon

Stephanie Lynn Vera

Defendant Attorneys

J Richard Harmon

Linda Szuhy Ressetar

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) RESPONSE filed by M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc re: #14 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION Motion to Deny Attorneys' Fees (Lane, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

#15

(#15) Appendix in Support filed by Technology Insurance Company Inc re #14 MOTION (Harmon, J). Modified text on 4/27/2023 (acm). (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#14

(#14) MOTION Motion to Deny Plaintiff's Claim for Attorneys' Fees and Brief in Support filed by Technology Insurance Company Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Harmon, J) Modified text on 4/27/2023 (acm). (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Lane, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2023. Discovery due by 1/5/2024. Status Report due by 1/5/2024. Motions due by 1/12/2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/25/2023) (axm) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/25/2023) (axm) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#10

(#10) TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for two-week docket beginning 4/22/2024 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/25/2023) (axm) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#9

(#9) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint) by Technology Insurance Company Inc. (Harmon, J) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#8

(#8) Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Technology Insurance Company Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Harmon, J) Modified text on 4/12/2023 (acm). (Entered: 04/11/2023)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lane, Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Technology Insurance Company Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Harmon, J) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#4

(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/21/2023. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/24/2023) (sxf) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Harmon, J) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

1 #4

Exhibit(s) Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit(s) Exhibit C

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13612548) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #8 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet) (Harmon, J) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE filed by M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc re: #14 MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION Motion to Deny Attorneys' Fees (Lane, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Appendix in Support filed by Technology Insurance Company Inc re #14 MOTION (Harmon, J). Modified text on 4/27/2023 (acm). (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION Motion to Deny Plaintiff's Claim for Attorneys' Fees and Brief in Support filed by Technology Insurance Company Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Harmon, J) Modified text on 4/27/2023 (acm). (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Lane, Robert) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/10/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2023. Discovery due by 1/5/2024. Status Report due by 1/5/2024. Motions due by 1/12/2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/25/2023) (axm) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: No later than 14 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/25/2023) (axm) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TRIAL SETTING ORDER: Trial set for two-week docket beginning 4/22/2024 before Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/25/2023) (axm) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order (Joint) by Technology Insurance Company Inc. (Harmon, J) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Technology Insurance Company Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Harmon, J) Modified text on 4/12/2023 (acm). (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting unopposed #6 MOTION for Leave to Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/5/2023) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Waive Local Counsel Requirement filed by M Central Residences Condominium Association Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lane, Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Technology Insurance Company Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Harmon, J) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/21/2023. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/24/2023) (sxf) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Harmon, J) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Technology Insurance Company, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13612548) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #8 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet) (Harmon, J) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less