This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 07:51:51

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by Lyttle against Commissioner Of Social Security in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-00036
  • Filing Date 06/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Government Benefit - Social Security Disability
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Glen E. Conrad
  • Courthouse Virginia Western District

Party Details

  • Defendant Commissioner Of Social Security
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Richard L. Lyttle
  • Represented By
    • Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
    • David F. Chermol
    • David F. Chermol

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#4

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#1

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proce...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard L. Lyttle. Commissioner Of Social Security served on 6/26/2019, answer due 10/24/2019.(Gillikin, Robert)
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#7) Oral ORDER granting #6 MOTION for David Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 6/25/19. (JCH)
  • 06/23/2019
  • (#6) MOTION for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3169211. by Richard L. Lyttle. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gillikin, Robert)
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued)(hnw)
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#4) SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (hnw)
  • 06/18/2019
  • (#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 6/18/2019. (hnw)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security, filed by Richard L. Lyttle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard L. Lyttle. (hnw)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.