Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:23 (UTC).

LYONS v. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 LYONS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley R. Chesler and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17051

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley R. Chesler

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORY LYONS

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JOHN DOE CORP. 1-10

JOHN DOE 1-10

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

JANE DOE 1-10

Defendant and Cross Claimant

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

E. DREW BRITCHER

Attorney at BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH, L.L.C.

175 Rock Road

Glen Rock, NJ 07452

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY

Attorney at Fishman McIntyre Berkeley Levine Samansky, PC

120 Eagle Rock Avenue

East Hanover, NJ 07936

 

Court Documents

6 #3

Exhibit Exhibits A through C

6 #2

Certification

6 #1

OA Requested

#6

(#6) BRIEF in Opposition filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION re #5 First MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 OA Requested, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A through C)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

5 #4

Text of Proposed Order

5 #3

Certificate of Service

5 #2

Brief

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) First MOTION to Remand by GREGORY LYONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BRITCHER, E.) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JANE DOE 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10, JOHN DOE CORP. 1-10 by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-5630-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911811), filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BRIEF in Opposition filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION re #5 First MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 OA Requested, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A through C)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 10/7/2019 Replies due by 10/15/2019. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jc, ) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION to Remand by GREGORY LYONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BRITCHER, E.) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4D on 10/24/19 at 10:15am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/18/19. (tjg, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JANE DOE 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10, JOHN DOE CORP. 1-10 by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION.(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION from Bergen County Superior Court, case number BER-L-5630-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9911811), filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERKELEY, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWRENCE M. BERKELEY