This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:09:55 (UTC).

Lyons v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Lyons filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David A. Ruiz and Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01567

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David A. Ruiz

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charisse Lyons

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clifford M. Farrell

Attorney at Manring & Farrell

167 North High Street, P.O. Box 15037

Columbus, OH 43215-0037

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Johnson

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland - Social Security

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Social Security Administration - Chicago

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/23/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 7/27/2020; by FedEx upon the US Attorney General on 7/29/2020; by FedEx upon the Social Security Administration on 7/29/2020 (unsigned marked C-19) filed on behalf of Charisse Lyons Related document(s) #5 . (J,FE) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/23/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security (c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,CA) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/23/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/16/2020. (B,R) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (B,R) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketJudge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Providing Information to US Attorney filed by Charisse Lyons. (Farrell, Clifford) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Charisse Lyons. (Farrell, Clifford) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Charisse Lyons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM-285 Attorney General, #3 USM-285 US Attorney, #4 USM-285 Regional Counsel, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney, #7 Summons Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less