This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2020 at 11:00:39 (UTC).

Lyons-Birsner v. The Madison Square Garden Company

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Lyons-Birsner filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Madison Square Garden Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03798

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Lyons-Birsner

Defendants

The Madison Square Garden Company d/b/a Madison Square Garden

The Madison Square Garden Company doing business as Madison Square Garden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse Curtis Rose

Attorney at The Rose Law Group, PLLC

3109 Newtown Avenue, Suite 309

Astoria, NY 11102

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander Phillip Fuchs

Attorney at Sutherland Asbill & Brennan

1114 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Lewis S. Wiener

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP (DC)

700 Sixth St. Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. MEMORANDUM ENDORSED. Defendant's time to answer extended to August 7, 2020. No further extension of Defendant's time to answer will be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an Initial Pretrial Conference will be held on August 10, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. by TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. At that date and time, the parties are directed to dial the Court's conference line at 888-251-2909 (access code 2123101). The parties are directed to file a proposed case management plan with the Court ahead of the August 10, 2020 conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/13/2020) (va) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#8

(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alexander P. Fuchs dated July 7, 2020. Document filed by The Madison Square Garden Company..(Fuchs, Alexander) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#7

(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alexander P. Fuchs dated June 9, 2020. Document filed by The Madison Square Garden Company..(Fuchs, Alexander) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Phillip Fuchs on behalf of The Madison Square Garden Company..(Fuchs, Alexander) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis S. Wiener on behalf of The Madison Square Garden Company..(Wiener, Lewis) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Madison Square Garden Company..(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Madison Square Garden Company, d/b/a Madison Square Garden, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Lyons-Birsner..(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Madison Square Garden Company d/b/a Madison Square Garden. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-19846855)Document filed by Deborah Lyons-Birsner..(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (va) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: The Madison Square Garden Company answer due 8/7/2020. (va) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. MEMORANDUM ENDORSED. Defendant's time to answer extended to August 7, 2020. No further extension of Defendant's time to answer will be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an Initial Pretrial Conference will be held on August 10, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. by TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. At that date and time, the parties are directed to dial the Court's conference line at 888-251-2909 (access code 2123101). The parties are directed to file a proposed case management plan with the Court ahead of the August 10, 2020 conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/13/2020) (va) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alexander P. Fuchs dated July 7, 2020. Document filed by The Madison Square Garden Company..(Fuchs, Alexander) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alexander P. Fuchs dated June 9, 2020. Document filed by The Madison Square Garden Company..(Fuchs, Alexander) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Phillip Fuchs on behalf of The Madison Square Garden Company..(Fuchs, Alexander) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis S. Wiener on behalf of The Madison Square Garden Company..(Wiener, Lewis) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Madison Square Garden Company..(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jesse Curtis Rose. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 443 (Civil Rights: Accomodations); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 446 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other); the County code has been modified to Queens; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jesse Curtis Rose. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Madison Square Garden Company d/b/a Madison Square Garden. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Madison Square Garden Company, d/b/a Madison Square Garden, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Lyons-Birsner..(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Madison Square Garden Company d/b/a Madison Square Garden. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-19846855)Document filed by Deborah Lyons-Birsner..(Rose, Jesse) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MADISON SQUARE GARDEN COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander P. Fuchs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis S. Wiener