This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 07:33:10 (UTC).

Lyon v. Foxfire Realty, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Lyon filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Foxfire Realty, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory A. Presnell and Philip R. Lammens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00531

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK LYON

Defendants

FOXFIRE REALTY, LLC

EUGENE BOONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Birk

Attorney at Matthew Birk, Esq., Law Office

309 Ne 1St St.

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant Attorney

Robert W. Batsel

Attorney at Gilligan, Gooding, Franjola & Batsel, P.A.

1531 Se 36Th Avenue

Ocala, FL 34471

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18869066) filed by MARK LYON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit Employment Agreement

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) Initial ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/29/2021. (HAI) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by MARK LYON. Related case(s): No (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by MARK LYON. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Foxfire Realty, LLC. (LAB) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Mark Lyon. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Eugene Boone. (HAI) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Eugene Boone.(Batsel, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Foxfire Realty, LLC. (Batsel, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Foxfire Realty, LLC. Related case(s): No (Batsel, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Foxfire Realty, LLC. Related case(s): No (Batsel, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Foxfire Realty, LLC. (Batsel, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Eugene Boone.(Batsel, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Eugene Boone. (HAI) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Mark Lyon. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Foxfire Realty, LLC. (LAB) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by MARK LYON. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by MARK LYON. Related case(s): No (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/29/2021. (HAI) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:21-cv-0531-GAP-PRL. (SJB) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18869066) filed by MARK LYON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less