This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:42:02 (UTC).

LYNN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 LYNN filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Anne E. Thompson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17219

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne E. Thompson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EFRAIN LYNN

Respondent

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALISON BRILL

22 South Clinton Avenue, Station Plaza #4, 4Th Floor

Trenton, NJ 08609

Respondent Attorneys

JACOB T. ELBERG

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

KEVIN M. O'DOWD

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Room 502

Newark, NJ 07102

CHARLES B. MCKENNA

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

NICHOLAS PAUL GRIPPO

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07102

STEVEN G. SANDERS

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street, Suite 700

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER consolidating civil case numbers 16-3786, 16-3810. 19-17219, and 16-3787 for Briefing and Disposition. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 09/20/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER that Respondent shall file an Answer which responds to the allegations of the motion #1 within 60 days of the entry of this Order; Petitioner may submit a response to the Answer within 30 days of receiving the Answer. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 09/05/2019. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/05/2019. (jem) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter from AUSA Steven G. Sanders. (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN G. SANDERS on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 07-454 (AET), filed by EFRAIN LYNN. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(abr) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (jmh) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER consolidating civil case numbers 16-3786, 16-3810. 19-17219, and 16-3787 for Briefing and Disposition. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 09/20/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER that Respondent shall file an Answer which responds to the allegations of the motion #1 within 60 days of the entry of this Order; Petitioner may submit a response to the Answer within 30 days of receiving the Answer. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 09/05/2019. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/05/2019. (jem) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from AUSA Steven G. Sanders. (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN G. SANDERS on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 07-454 (AET), filed by EFRAIN LYNN. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(abr) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.