Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:32:10 (UTC).

Lynn v. MCT Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Lynn filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against MCT Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elayna J. Youchah and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02092

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Greta Lynn

Defendant

MCT Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin L. Hernandez

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin L. Hernandez

8872 S. Eastern Ave., Suite 270

Las Vegas, NV 89123

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greta Lynn. MCT Group, Inc. served on 12/21/2019. (Hernandez, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MCT Group, Inc. (JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Greta Lynn. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hernandez, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MCT Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5802283) by Greta Lynn. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hernandez, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greta Lynn. MCT Group, Inc. served on 12/21/2019. (Hernandez, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to MCT Group, Inc. (JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Greta Lynn. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hernandez, Kevin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MCT Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5802283) by Greta Lynn. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hernandez, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCT GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin L. Hernandez