Lynk Labs, Inc. v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14432046), filed by Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lynk Labs, Inc.. to Defendants Home Depot USA, Inc., The Home Depot Inc., and Home Depot Product Authority, LLC (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Home Depot USA, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to The Home Depot Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for James A. Shimota ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14435476) by on behalf of Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Devon C. Beane ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14435540) by on behalf of Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for Nelson M. Hua ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14435591) by on behalf of Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James A. Shimota for Lynk Labs, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Devon C. Beane for Lynk Labs, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nelson M. Hua for Lynk Labs, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynk Labs, Inc.. Home Depot USA, Inc. served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynk Labs, Inc.. The Home Depot Inc. served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynk Labs, Inc.. Home Depot Product Authority, LLC served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot USA, Inc., The Home Depot Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Defendants Home Depot USA, Inc., The Home Depot Inc., and Home Depot Product Authority, LLC's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Lynk Labs' Complaint (Dkt. 1) is extended until April 12, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Home Depot Product Authority, LLC answer due 4/12/2021; Home Depot USA, Inc. answer due 4/12/2021; The Home Depot Inc. answer due 4/12/2021. (am) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot USA, Inc., The Home Depot Inc. amending, filed by Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less