This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2022 at 07:55:51 (UTC).

Lynk Labs, Inc. v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 Lynk Labs, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Home Depot USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05021

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Lynk Labs, Inc.

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.

The Home Depot Inc

Home Depot Product Authority, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Nelson M. Hua

Anna Shabalov

Darlene Ghavimi

Devon C. Beane

James A. Shimota

John L. North

Martha Logan Decker

Steven G. Hill

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Aaron Gabriel Fountain

Nicholas G. Papastavros

Jackob Ben-Ezra

Brian K. Erickson

Jennifer Librach Nall

Christopher G. Campbell

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

83 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

83 #1

Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion

83 #83

Main Document

82 #4

Exhibit Ex. 4 - Deposition Excerpt

#79

RESTRICTED

#77

RESTRICTED

#76

RESTRICTED

#75

RESTRICTED

1 #20

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #17

Exhibit Q

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #4

Exhibit D

#5

(#5) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

246 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSubmission of #83 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #81 Response in Support of Motion,, , to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (dob) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Granting #79 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Aaron Gabriel Fountain by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on January 25, 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Granting #77 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anna Shabalov by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on January 25, 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Granting #76 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nelson Hua by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on January 25, 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order Granting #75 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jackob Ben-Ezra by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on January 25, 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) Modified on 1/25/2022 to correct text (lme). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#83) MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #81 Response in Support of Motion,, with Brief In Support by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Campbell, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#82) REPLY in Support re #56 MOTION to Stay Pending Patent Office Review of the Validity of All Asserted Patent Claims filed by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Best Med. In'l, Inc. v. Elekta Inc. Slip op., #2 Exhibit Ex.2 - LynkLab.com Home Page, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Lynk Supplemental Responses, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Deposition Excerpt, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - ThermoLife International, LLC v. Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Slip op., #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - AirWatch LLC v. Good Technology Corp., Slip op)(Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 1/14/2022 to edit event selected(dob). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#81) PROVISIONALLY SEALED REPLY in Support re #56 MOTION to Stay Pending Patent Office Review of the Validity of All Asserted Patent Claims filed by Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Best Med. In'l, Inc. v. Elekta Inc. Slip op., #2 Exhibit Ex.2 - LynkLab.com Home Page, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Lynk Supplemental Responses, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Deposition Excerpt, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - ThermoLife International, LLC v. Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Slip op., #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - AirWatch LLC v. Good Technology Corp., Slip op)(Campbell, Christopher) Modified on 1/14/2022 to edit event selected (dob). (Entered: 01/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #79 APPLICATION for Admission of Aaron Gabriel Fountain Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11499664).. Attorney Aaron Gabriel Fountain added appearing on behalf of Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., The Home Depot Inc, The Home Depot Inc (gas) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #76 APPLICATION for Admission of Nelson Hua Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11496819). Attorney Nelson M. Hua added appearing on behalf of Lynk Labs, Inc., (cdg) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
93 More Docket Entries
02/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Darlene Ghavimi for James A. Shimota ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14435476) by on behalf of Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Ghavimi, Darlene) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Home Depot Product Authority, LLC. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to The Home Depot Inc.. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Home Depot USA, Inc.. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2021

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lynk Labs, Inc.. to Defendants Home Depot USA, Inc., The Home Depot Inc., and Home Depot Product Authority, LLC (Ghavimi, Darlene) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ghavimi, Darlene) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Ghavimi, Darlene) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14432046), filed by Lynk Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ghavimi, Darlene) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less