This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/24/2023 at 07:57:46 (UTC).

LYNCH v. EQUIFAX INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 LYNCH filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EQUIFAX INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00276

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEXTER CURTIS LYNCH

Defendants

EQUIFAX INC.

EXPERIAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JAKOB F. WILLIAMS

MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN

STEPHEN C. SCOTT

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint against EQUIFAX INC. and EXPERIAN INC. filed by DEXTER CURTIS LYNCH. (mbh) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#2

(#2) Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 20005944. (mbh) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#3

(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (mbh) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INC. and EXPERIAN INC. Forwarded To: pro se on 1/24/23. (mbh) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB F. WILLIAMS on behalf of EQUIFAX INC. with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Stephen C. Scott, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16520267.) filed by EXPERIAN INC..Certificate of Counsel; Certificate of Service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF STEPHEN C. SCOTT, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/27/23. 2/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE: A STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/6/2023 AT 3:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (mbh) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EQUIFAX INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

11 #1

Memorandum

#12

(#12) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. with Certificate of Service by EQUIFAX INC..(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE by EXPERIAN INC. re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM NOTICE OF JOINDER IN EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC's MOTION TO DISMISS (GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#14

(#14) Notice: The Telephone/Rule 16 Status Conference scheduled for 3/6/23 is cancelled. (mbh) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice: The Telephone/Rule 16 Status Conference scheduled for 3/6/23 is cancelled. (mbh) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by EXPERIAN INC. re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM NOTICE OF JOINDER IN EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC's MOTION TO DISMISS (GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. with Certificate of Service by EQUIFAX INC..(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EQUIFAX INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE: A STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/6/2023 AT 3:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. (mbh) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF STEPHEN C. SCOTT, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/27/23. 2/27/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Stephen C. Scott, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-16520267.) filed by EXPERIAN INC..Certificate of Counsel; Certificate of Service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB F. WILLIAMS on behalf of EQUIFAX INC. with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, JAKOB) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INC. and EXPERIAN INC. Forwarded To: pro se on 1/24/23. (mbh) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES (mbh) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 20005944. (mbh) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against EQUIFAX INC. and EXPERIAN INC. filed by DEXTER CURTIS LYNCH. (mbh) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less