This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 07:06:07 (UTC).

Lyft, Inc. v. Quartz Auto Technologies LLC

Case Summary

On March 17, 2021 Lyft Inc. (“Lyft”) represented by Elizabeth Kathleen Boggs and Jeremy J Taylor of Baker Botts LLP filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Quartz Auto Technologies LLC (“Quartz Auto” or Defendant”) seeking a declaration of non-infringement of any intellectual property of Quartz Auto by Lyft and other equitable relief. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Susan van Keulen and Judge Jon S. Tigar presiding.

In 2012, Lyft launched a peer-to-peer marketplace for on-demand ridesharing and has continued to pioneer innovations aligned with its mission to improve people’s lives with the world’s best transportation. Today, Lyft is one of the largest multimodal transportation platforms in the United States and Canada.

In the complaint, Lyft has alleged that “Counsel for Quartz Auto previously identified U.S. Patent Nos. 7,007,013; 9,691,275; 6,944,443; and 6,847,871 (collectively the “Patents-in-Suit”) to Lyft in a presentation. Quartz Auto alleged the Patents-in-Suit were relevant to Lyft and sought to extract payment from Lyft to license a portfolio including the Patents-in-Suit. On February 16, 2021, counsel for Quartz Auto e-mailed to Lyft’s counsel claim charts alleging infringement of the Patents-in-Suit by Lyft, writing, “We believe this demonstrates additional value to Lyft of taking a license under the Quartz Auto portfolio.”

Quartz Auto has also alleged patent infringement by other corporations based in California and in this District, including by filing suits alleging infringement of patents against other corporations based in San Francisco and this District, including at least Postmates Inc. and Uber Technologies, Inc. etc. On information and belief, Quartz Auto is also contemplating alleging infringement of the Patents-in-Suit against other companies located in this District.

Lyft has further contended that “Lyft does not infringe the Patents-in-Suit and files this Complaint for declaratory judgment to clear itself of the allegations cast by Quartz Auto over Lyft and its products.” “This relief is necessary because Quartz Auto has: (a) asserted ownership of the Patents-in-Suit; and (b) accused Lyft of infringing the Patents-in-Suit, including by sending to counsel for Lyft claim charts purporting to show infringement by Lyft of the Patents-in-Suit.”

There are four claims of relief laid down by Lyft. The first claim is for the declaratory judgment of non-infringement of U.S. Patent 7,007,013. The second claim is for the declaratory judgment of non-infringement of the U.S. Patent 9,691,275. The third claim is for the declaratory judgment of non-infringement of the U.S. Patent 6,994,443. The fourth claim is for the declaratory judgment of non-infringement of the U.S. Patent 6,847,871.

In its prayer for relief, Lyft has requested the court to enter the judgment in favour of Lyft and against Quartz Auto by declaring that Lyft and Lyft’s products do not infringe and have not infringed, directly or indirectly, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Patents-in-Suit; and thus, find an exception under 35 U.S.C. § 285. The Court may further award costs, reasonable fees and other equitable relief as it may deem fit.

 This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01871

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lyft, Inc.

Defendant

Quartz Auto Technologies LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Kathleen Boggs

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

1001 Page Mill Road, Building One, Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Jeremy J Taylor

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

101 California Street, Suite 3600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Jon A Birmingham

Attorney at Fitch Even Tabin and Flannery

20929 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 47403

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. re #24 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #15 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Noninfringement Previously Filed Under Seal)(Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/29/2021) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#24

(#24) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

15 #7

Exhibit G

15 #6

Exhibit F

15 #5

Exhibit E

15 #4

Exhibit D

15 #3

Exhibit C

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#25) NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. re #24 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #15 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Noninfringement Previously Filed Under Seal)(Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/29/2021) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Kathleen Boggs (Boggs, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Quartz Auto Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15712197.). Filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

36 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE by Lyft, Inc. re #24 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #15 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Noninfringement Previously Filed Under Seal)(Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/29/2021) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byQuartz Auto Technologies LLC. (Birmingham, Jon) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER RE: MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re #4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Lyft, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ******PLEASE DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR.***** Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #4 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) Modified on 4/21/2021 (mllS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Certificate of Interested Entities by Quartz Auto Technologies LLC and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Birmingham, Jon) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint [L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Quartz Auto Technologies LLC and Lyft, Inc.. (Birmingham, Jon) (Filed on 4/20/2021) Modified on 4/21/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, First Amended Complaint served on Quartz Auto Technologies LLC c/o Keith Machen on 4/8/2021, filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/13/2021) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Summons Issued as to Quartz Auto Technologies LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Proposed Summons. (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lyft, Inc... (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/26/2021) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Quartz Auto Technologies LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding U.S. Patents Nos. 7,007,013; 9,691,275; 6,944,443; 6,847,871 (cc: form mailed to register). (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lyft, Inc. (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Boggs, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/17/2021) Modified on 4/21/2021 (mllS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Kathleen Boggs (Boggs, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Quartz Auto Technologies LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15712197.). Filed byLyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quartz Auto Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon A Birmingham