This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2022 at 07:27:05 (UTC).

LY BERDITCHEV CORP. v. KAHNALYTICS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 LY BERDITCHEV CORP filed an Other lawsuit against KAHNALYTICS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-19946

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LY BERDITCHEV CORP.

Defendants

KAHNALYTICS, INC.

BREANNA CAMPBELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK BERKOWITZ

Attorney at TARTER KRINSKY & DROGIN LLP

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Defendant Attorney

PATRICK J. BOYLE

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas, 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting the #13 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time, up to and including January 21, 2022, in which to file its answer or responsive motion to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/22/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC.. (BOYLE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#12

(#12) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on January 21, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/16/2016. (sms) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

10 #2

Text of Proposed Order

10 #1

Certification

10 #10

Main Document

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Certification

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC.. (BOYLE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. BOYLE on behalf of BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC. (BOYLE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LY BERDITCHEV CORP.. BREANNA CAMPBELL served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LY BERDITCHEV CORP.. KAHNALYTICS, INC. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

4 #1

Complaint

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference previously set for January 21, 2022 is adjourned to February 1, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/22/2021. (sms) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/21/2022. (qa, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting the #13 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time, up to and including January 21, 2022, in which to file its answer or responsive motion to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/22/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC.. (BOYLE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on January 21, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed Joint Discovery Plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/16/2016. (sms) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER: The two applications for admission pro hac vice (ECF Nos. 9, 10) are administratively terminated without prejudice, as: (1) the applicants' certifications lack handwritten signatures; and (2) there is no indication whether the consent of opposing counsel to the admissions was sought. Local counsel is directed to consult Local Civil Rule 101.1(c) and paragraph 5 of the Court's # Civil Case Management Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/16/2021. (sms) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice JOHN S. WORDEN by BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BOYLE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice SARA R. KRASTINS by BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BOYLE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #8 submitted by BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/21/2021. (qa, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #8 Application for Clerk's Extension filed by Patrick Boyle on 12/6/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, please use the event "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order". This message is for informational purposes only, no further action is required. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC.. (BOYLE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. BOYLE on behalf of BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC. (BOYLE, PATRICK) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LY BERDITCHEV CORP.. BREANNA CAMPBELL served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LY BERDITCHEV CORP.. KAHNALYTICS, INC. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO120 Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (qa, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LY BERDITCHEV CORP.. (BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BREANNA CAMPBELL, KAHNALYTICS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12973457) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LY BERDITCHEV CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BERKOWITZ, MARK) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Joseph Boyle Esquire