Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 07:08:31 (UTC).

Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Luxottica Group S p A filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01347

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Luxottica Group S.p.A.

Oakley, Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

rnebws.com

vannordenmusic.com

Fred Joyce

rbsau.com

bookmandentistry.com

rbvcc.com

Lorraine Rhodes

healing4tomorrow.com

Jeanne Fern

Terry Reese

ban-usa.com

chiquicuadros.com

po-ly outdoor product store

resunrb.com

mankatodotnet.com

Liu Demei

arizonawebsites.net

301 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Other Attorneys

Depeng Bi

Attorney at The Law Offices Of Konrad Sherinian, Llc

1755 Park Street, Suite 200

Naperville, IL 60563

Larry Ford Banister, II

Attorney at The Law Office of L. Ford Banister, II

Po Box 3514 Pmb 23332

New York, NY 10008

Charles Edward McElvenny

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles E. McElvenny

20 N Clark St, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60602

Amy Elizabeth Paluch-Epton

Attorney at Law Office of Paluch- Epton

438 E. 49Th Street, Suite 3

Chicago, IL 60615

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1230bruceyu, Topsniper Outdoor Store by Charles Edward McElvenny (McElvenny, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#47

(#47) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1230bruceyu, Topsniper Outdoor Store by Amy Elizabeth Paluch-Epton (Paluch-Epton, Amy) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#46

(#46) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1230bruceyu, Topsniper Outdoor Store by Larry Ford Banister, II (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#44

(#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#43

(#43) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MadRoad Store by Depeng Bi (Bi, Depeng) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

42 #1

Declaration of RiKaleigh C. Johnson

#42

(#42) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of RiKaleigh C. Johnson)(Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#41

(#41) PRELIMINARY Injunction Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 4/3/2019. Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

1 #3

Schedule A

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15519489. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1230bruceyu, Topsniper Outdoor Store by Charles Edward McElvenny (McElvenny, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1230bruceyu, Topsniper Outdoor Store by Amy Elizabeth Paluch-Epton (Paluch-Epton, Amy) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1230bruceyu, Topsniper Outdoor Store by Larry Ford Banister, II (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. as to certain Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MadRoad Store by Depeng Bi (Bi, Depeng) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of RiKaleigh C. Johnson)(Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to XIE JI PING and all other Defendants identified in the Second Amended Complaint. (mc, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) PRELIMINARY Injunction Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 4/3/2019. Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Defendant did not appear. For reasons stated on the record, plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #36 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (tt, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Registration Numbers) (tt, ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15519489. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Luxottica Group S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oakley, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant