This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2022 at 09:14:37 (UTC).

Lux et al v. Quiktrip Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 Lux filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Quiktrip Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01754

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johni Lux

Seta Mathew

Defendants

Quiktrip Corporation

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abdoukadir Abdul Jaiteh

Elizabeth Marie Gonzalez

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea M Swan

Karen Christine Stafford

Victoria Renee Kelly

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit A-H

1 #4

Attachment

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quiktrip Corporation. (Stafford, Karen) (MYE) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21202301. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1754-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 12, 2023, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/14/22. (MAW) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than November 14, 2022 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/14/22. (MAW) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#6

(#6) *REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Johni Lux, Seta Mathew. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) *Modified to add additional filer on 11/15/2022 (REK). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/2/2023. Dispositive motions due by 1/12/2024 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/16/22. (MAW) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#9

(#9) *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Abdoukadir Abdul Jaiteh terminating Alex Matthew Romero. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) *Modified to correct event and text on 11/21/2022 (REK). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

11/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Abdoukadir Abdul Jaiteh terminating Alex Matthew Romero. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) *Modified to correct event and text on 11/21/2022 (REK). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/2/2023. Dispositive motions due by 1/12/2024 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/16/22. (MAW) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #6 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 12 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly.Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/16/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) *REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Johni Lux, Seta Mathew. (Jaiteh, Abdoukadir) *Modified to add additional filer on 11/15/2022 (REK). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than November 14, 2022 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/14/22. (MAW) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 12, 2023, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/14/22. (MAW) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21202301. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1754-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quiktrip Corporation. (Stafford, Karen) (MYE) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022

Docket***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Quiktrip Corporation. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.*** (MYE) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022

Docket***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Arbitration upon QuikTrip Corporation on 9/13/2022. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/16/2022.) (MYE) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-051948. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21202301 filed by Quiktrip Corporation. (Stafford, Karen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-H, #4 Attachment)(MYE) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less