This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2020 at 15:33:49 (UTC).

Luttrell v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 Luttrell filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Luttrell

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amber C.B. Eubank

Attorney at The Mark L. Morgan Law Group, LLP

426 S. Fourth Street

Danville, KY 40422

Defendant Attorney

Timothy D. Thompson

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/28/2020 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Counsel; USMS (CDF) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER: 1. Case transfer to the Western District of Kentucky; 2. The Court's previous #4 Order Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is VACATED. The clerk SHALL strike the Order from the record. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/21/2020.(SLH)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#4

(#4) STRICKEN per #5 Order: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: 1. Pltf's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; 2. Pltf may proceed w/out payment of cost. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/20/2020. (SLH)cc: COR Modified text on 5/21/2020 (SLH). [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) USMS Notice of SUMMONS Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security. United States Attorney served on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (CDF) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 6/19/2020. (CDF) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summonses Issued and forwarded to the USMS as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 (USA), #2 USM-285 (SSA), #3 USM-285 (USAG)) (CDF) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/28/2020 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Counsel; USMS (CDF) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing Tendered Summons by Deborah Luttrell (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for US Attorney General, #2 Summons Summons for SSA, #3 Summons Summons for US Attorney) (Eubank, Amber) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (CDF). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. Tendered summons forms must be resubmitted in accordance with transfer to the Western District of Kentucky. (CDF) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (JM) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:20-cv-00201. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Reopen Document #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Luttrell (SLH) [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: 1. Case transfer to the Western District of Kentucky; 2. The Court's previous #4 Order Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is VACATED. The clerk SHALL strike the Order from the record. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/21/2020.(SLH)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STRICKEN per #5 Order: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: 1. Pltf's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; 2. Pltf may proceed w/out payment of cost. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 5/20/2020. (SLH)cc: COR Modified text on 5/21/2020 (SLH). [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Claria H. Boom for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Luttrell (SLH) [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Luttrell (SLH) [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (SLH) [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Deborah Luttrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - SSA, #3 Summons - USAG, #4 Summons - USA EDKY)(SLH) Modified text on 5/20/2020 (SLH). [Transferred from kyed on 5/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy D. Thompson