This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2021 at 08:49:55 (UTC).

Luttrell v. Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Luttrell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00960

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia L. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cindy Luttrell

Defendants

Techmachinery, LLC doing business as TechMach also known as Technical Machine

Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation

Technical Machine

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant

Techmachinery, LLC

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation

3Rd Party Defendants

Technical Machinery Sales, Inc.

Doosan Infracore North America, LLC

Doosan Mecatec Machine Tools BG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jill R. Rembusch

Attorney at HEIN SCHNEIDER AND BOND PC

2244 South Brentwood Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63144

Nathan J. Risch

Attorney at HEIN SCHNEIDER AND BOND PC

2244 South Brentwood Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63144

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Michael J. Bedesky

Attorney at HEYL ROYSTER PC - St Louis

701 Market Streetsuite 1505

St. Louis, MO 63101

Jonathan T. Barton

Attorney at STANTON BARTON LLC

8000 Maryland Ave.Suite 450

St. Louis, MO 63105

Michael Bai

Attorney at LITTLETON PARK LLP - New York

39 Broadway29Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan T. Barton

Attorney at STANTON BARTON LLC

8000 Maryland Ave.Suite 450

St. Louis, MO 63105

Michael Bai

Attorney at LITTLETON PARK LLP - New York

39 Broadway29Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

28 #1

Summons Technical Machinery Sales, Inc.

#28

27 #1

Summons Doosan Mecatec Machine Tools BG

#27

#26

#25

#24

#22

#21

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

3 #2

Summons Summons- TechMach

3 #1

Summons Summons- Doosan

#3

2 #1

Supplement Original Filing Form

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Defendant Techmachinery, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Techmachinery, LLC Process Server: North Winds Process (Attachments: #1 Summons Technical Machinery Sales, Inc.)(Bedesky, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Defendant Techmachinery, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Techmachinery, LLC Process Server: Ameriserve, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Doosan Mecatec Machine Tools BG)(Bedesky, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Defendant Techmachinery, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Techmachinery, LLC Process Server: William Stage, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Doosan Infracore North America LLC)(Bedesky, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation.(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation. Parent companies: Doosan Machine Tools Co., Ltd., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#23) Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendant Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/28/2021. (JAB) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation, Techmachinery, LLC Amendment to #1 Complaint, filed by Cindy Luttrell. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Cindy Luttrell.(CLO) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 9/21/2021. (CLO) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: The Court therefore finds that it has diversity jurisdiction in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 9/21/2021. (CLO) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation.(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael H. Bai. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8829120) by Defendant Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bai, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation.(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cindy Luttrell. Techmachinery, LLC served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Rembusch, Jill) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Cindy Luttrell. Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (Rembusch, Jill) Modified date served on 8/13/2021 (CLO). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney Jill R. Rembusch. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (JKL) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan J. Risch for Plaintiff Cindy Luttrell. (Risch, Nathan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Cindy Luttrell Process Server: ProServe dba Coast 2 Coast (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons- Doosan, #2 Summons Summons- TechMach)(Rembusch, Jill) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/2/2021 to correct PDF error) (JKL). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Cindy Luttrell. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Original Filing Form)(Rembusch, Jill) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8789262, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Cindy Luttrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Rembusch, Jill) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Doosan Machine Tools America Corporation is a litigant