This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 07:48:28

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by LUTCHER against JOHNSON JOHNSON in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-17136
  • Filing Date 08/23/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Lois H. Goodman
  • Courthouse New Jersey District

Party Details

  • Plaintiff BETTY SMITH
  • Represented By
    • JENNIFER A. LENZE
  • Plaintiff JACQUELINE LUTCHER
  • Represented By
    • JENNIFER A. LENZE
  • Defendant JOHNSON & JOHNSON
  • Represented By
    • SCOTT A. JAMES
    • KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
    • SCOTT A. JAMES
  • Defendant JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • In Re JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff THE ESTATE OF BETTY SMITH
  • Represented By
    • JENNIFER A. LENZE
  • Defendant JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
  • Represented By
    • SCOTT A. JAMES
    • KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
    • SCOTT A. JAMES

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JO...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOH...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf o...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., ...

Fees Apply
1 #3

Summons J&J Consumer

Fees Apply
1 #2

Summons J&J

Fees Apply
1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON ...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
  • 09/20/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
  • 08/26/2019
  • Member Case Direct File on 8/26/2019, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jdb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. F/K/A JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9915865) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JACQUELINE LUTCHER, BETTY SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons J&J, #3 Summons J&J Consumer)(LENZE, JENNIFER) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.