This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:39 (UTC).

Lust v. LTF Club Management Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Lust filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against LTF Club Management Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ruben Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03344

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ruben Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miracle Lust

Defendants

LFT Club Operations Company, Inc., d/b/a Life Time Fitness

Shqipe Lekaj, individually

LTF Club Management Company, LLC

Shqipe Lekaj

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John William Billhorn

Attorney at Billhorn Law Firm

53 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 840

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Melissa Anne Siebert

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

111 South Wacker Dr.

Chicago, IL 60606

Erika Anne Dirk

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.l.p.

111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the amended complaint by 7/30/2019. The parties are directed to file the joint status report by 8/1/2019. The status hearing set for 7/17/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/7/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

17 #1

Notice of Filing

#17

(#17) FIRST AMENDED complaint by Miracle Lust against LFT Club Operations Company, Inc., Shqipe Lekaj (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant Shqipe Lekaj's uncontested motion for extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiff's complaint #14 is granted. Defendant Lekaj is given until 7/10/2019 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint. The motion hearing set for 7/2/2019 is stricken. (rao, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#15

(#15) UNCONTESTED NOTICE of Motion by Erika Anne Dirk for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Dirk, Erika) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#14

(#14) UNCONTESTED MOTION by Defendant Shqipe Lekaj for extension of time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dirk, Erika)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 6/26/2019 (aee, ). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shqipe Lekaj by Erika Anne Dirk (Dirk, Erika) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant LTF Club Management Company, LLC's uncontested motion for extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' complaint #10 is granted. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' complaint by 7/10/2019. The motion hearing set for 6/12/2019 is stricken. (rao, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or respond to Complaint - UNCONTESTED (Siebert, Melissa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#7

(#7) REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $400.00, receipt no. 26HHMGSB, (Attachments: #1 Group Exhibit A)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 7/12/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 7/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

5 #1

Notice of Filing

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miracle Lust as to LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Miracle Lust by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Miracle Lust - Consent To Sue

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT MIRACLE LUST, on behalf of herself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. LFT CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., d/b/a LIFETIME FITNESS BURR RIDGE, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION AND SHQIPE LEKAJ, INDIVIDUALLY filed by Miracle Lust; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839063. (Attachments: #1 Miracle Lust - Consent To Sue)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the amended complaint by 7/30/2019. The parties are directed to file the joint status report by 8/1/2019. The status hearing set for 7/17/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/7/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) FIRST AMENDED complaint by Miracle Lust against LFT Club Operations Company, Inc., Shqipe Lekaj (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant Shqipe Lekaj's uncontested motion for extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiff's complaint #14 is granted. Defendant Lekaj is given until 7/10/2019 to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint. The motion hearing set for 7/2/2019 is stricken. (rao, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) UNCONTESTED NOTICE of Motion by Erika Anne Dirk for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Dirk, Erika) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) UNCONTESTED MOTION by Defendant Shqipe Lekaj for extension of time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dirk, Erika)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 6/26/2019 (aee, ). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shqipe Lekaj by Erika Anne Dirk (Dirk, Erika) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant LTF Club Management Company, LLC's uncontested motion for extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiffs' complaint #10 is granted. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' complaint by 7/10/2019. The motion hearing set for 6/12/2019 is stricken. (rao, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Motion by Melissa Anne Siebert for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Siebert, Melissa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or respond to Complaint - UNCONTESTED (Siebert, Melissa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. by Erika Anne Dirk (Dirk, Erika) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. by Melissa Anne Siebert (Siebert, Melissa) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $400.00, receipt no. 26HHMGSB, (Attachments: #1 Group Exhibit A)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 7/12/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 7/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. (rao, ) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miracle Lust as to LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LFT Club Operations Company, Inc. (ew, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Miracle Lust by John William Billhorn (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT MIRACLE LUST, on behalf of herself, and all other plaintiffs similarly situated, known and unknown, v. LFT CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., d/b/a LIFETIME FITNESS BURR RIDGE, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION AND SHQIPE LEKAJ, INDIVIDUALLY filed by Miracle Lust; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15839063. (Attachments: #1 Miracle Lust - Consent To Sue)(Billhorn, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.