This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 08:02:40 (UTC).

LUO v. OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 LUO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against OWEN J ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PETRESE B. TUCKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETRESE B. TUCKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENN-CHING LUO

Birchrunville, PA 19421

Defendants

SHARON W. MONTANYE

SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP

GEOFFREY BALL

THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT

JONATHAN P. RIBA

JUSTIN D. BARBETTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

AARON E. MOORE

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY AND BACON

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market Street, Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JUSTIN D. BARBETTA

Attorney at SWEET STEVENS KATZ & WILLIAMS LLP

331 E. Butler Avenue, Po Box 5069

New Britain, PA 18901

KEVIN R. BRADFORD

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

1600 Arch Street, 3Rd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Text of Proposed Order

10 #1

Brief

#10

(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GEOFFREY BALL, OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT.Brief in supprt, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BARBETTA, JUSTIN) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BRADFORD, KEVIN) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss filed by JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MOORE, AARON) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO REGISTER AS AN ECF USER IN THE ECF SYSTEM filed by JENN-CHING LUO.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jaa, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENN-CHING LUO, re: Tonia Swavely - Process Server, served Summons and Complaint upon Terriann Preston-Simpson, on behalf of DEFT THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION by personal service on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (kw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENN-CHING LUO, re: Tonia Swavely - Process Server served Summons and Complaint upon Marlene Caprerri on behalf of JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP by personal service on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (kw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENN-CHING LUO, re: Tonia Swavely - Process Server, served Summons and Complaint upon Joyce Mowrer on behalf of DEFTS GEOFFREY BALL, OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT by personal service on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019.(kw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by AARON E. MOORE on behalf of JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP with Certificate of Service(MOORE, AARON) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#2

(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GEOFFREY BALL, JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP, THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190583.), filed by JENN-CHING LUO.(jwl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GEOFFREY BALL, OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT.Brief in supprt, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BARBETTA, JUSTIN) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BRADFORD, KEVIN) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss filed by JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MOORE, AARON) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO REGISTER AS AN ECF USER IN THE ECF SYSTEM filed by JENN-CHING LUO.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jaa, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENN-CHING LUO, re: Tonia Swavely - Process Server, served Summons and Complaint upon Terriann Preston-Simpson, on behalf of DEFT THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION by personal service on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (kw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENN-CHING LUO, re: Tonia Swavely - Process Server served Summons and Complaint upon Marlene Caprerri on behalf of JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP by personal service on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (kw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENN-CHING LUO, re: Tonia Swavely - Process Server, served Summons and Complaint upon Joyce Mowrer on behalf of DEFTS GEOFFREY BALL, OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT by personal service on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019.(kw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by AARON E. MOORE on behalf of JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP with Certificate of Service(MOORE, AARON) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JENN-CHING LUO. (jwl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Summons Issued as to GEOFFREY BALL, JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP, THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Seven Forwarded To: Pro se plaintiff on 1/8/19 (jwl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GEOFFREY BALL, JUSTIN D. BARBETTA, SHARON W. MONTANYE, OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT, JONATHAN P. RIBA, SWEET STEVENS KATZ WILLIAMS LLP, THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 190583.), filed by JENN-CHING LUO.(jwl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OWEN J. ROBERTS SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant