This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2020 at 03:06:44 (UTC).

Bradford Lund v. David J. Cowan et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Bradford Lund filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against David J Cowan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01894

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradford D Lund

Defendants

Judge PRO TEM David J. Cowan

Los Angeles County Superior Court

David J. Cowan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph P Busch, III

Attorney at The Pitet Firm PC

100 Bayview Circle Suite 210

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Sandra L Slaton

Attorney at Horne Slaton PLLC

6720 North Scottsdale Road Suite 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85253

Lanny J Davis

Attorney at Davis Goldberg Galper PLLC

1700 K Street Nw Suite 825

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Lawrence Green

Attorney at Best Best and Krieger LLP

655 West Broadway 15Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55764 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #43 as to plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#43

(#43) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,, #42 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27397560.) (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#42

(#42) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #27 #31 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Dismissal of a complaint without leave to amend is appropriate where further amendment of the claims would be futile. See Chappel v. Lab. Corp. of Am., 232 F.3d 719, 72526 (9th Cir. 2000). Plaintiff has amended his complaint once, the Court has denied a second attempt to amend the FAC on the basis of futility, and as explained above, the Court does not find that Plaintiff can litigate the issues he raises before this Court under either 1983 or the ADA. Because the Court finds that further amendment of the operative complaint would be futile, the Court's dismissal of Plaintiff's lawsuit iswithout leave to amend. (See document for further details). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

31 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#31

(#35) REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #31 filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

27 #4

Request for Judicial Notice Part 3 of 3

27 #3

Request for Judicial Notice Part 2 of 3

27 #2

Request for Judicial Notice Part 1 of 3

27 #1

Memorandum

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55764 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #43 as to plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,, #42 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27397560.) (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #27 #31 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Dismissal of a complaint without leave to amend is appropriate where further amendment of the claims would be futile. See Chappel v. Lab. Corp. of Am., 232 F.3d 719, 72526 (9th Cir. 2000). Plaintiff has amended his complaint once, the Court has denied a second attempt to amend the FAC on the basis of futility, and as explained above, the Court does not find that Plaintiff can litigate the issues he raises before this Court under either 1983 or the ADA. Because the Court finds that further amendment of the operative complaint would be futile, the Court's dismissal of Plaintiff's lawsuit iswithout leave to amend. (See document for further details). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE Notice of Errata re Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court. (Green, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Plaintiffs motion to file a sur-reply is DENIED. Dkt. #38 . The case citations and additional evidence included in Defendants Reply brief are not new because they were raised in response to arguments made in Plaintiffs Opposition brief. See Terrell v. Contra Costa Cty., 232 F. App'x 626, 629 n.2 (9th Cir. 2007); see also GemCap Lending I, LLC v. Mann, 2019 WL 7945597, at *5 (C.D. Cal. Oct. 30, 2019); Crossfit, Inc. v. Nat'l Strength & Conditioning Ass'n, 2017 WL 4700070, at *3 (S.D. Cal. Oct. 19, 2017); Edwards v. Toys "R" Us, 527 F. Supp. 2d 1197, 1205 (C.D. Cal. 2007). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) OPPOSITION opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Surreply #38 filed by Defendants David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court. (Green, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Surreply filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Addendum, #2 Declaration Declaration of Sandra Slaton, #3 Exhibit Proposed Surreply) (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants; and #31 MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff - The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing previously scheduled for 05/11/2020 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #27 filed by Defendants David J. Cowan, Los Angeles County Superior Court. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice)(Green, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #31 filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sandra L. Slaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531507) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Application is incomplete. Applicant failed to provide email address. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lanny J. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/27/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531442) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sandra L. Slaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531507) filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lanny J. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bradford D Lund (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/27/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-25531442) filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25531061 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Bradford D Lund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Joseph P Busch, III added to party Bradford D Lund(pty:pla))(Busch, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less