Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:37:06 (UTC).

Luna-Flores et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Luna-Flores filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against U S Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey T. Miller and Barbara Lynn Major. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00316

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey T. Miller

Referral Judge

Barbara Lynn Major

 

Party Details

Petitioners

E.G. Luna-Bravo

C. Lopez-Luna

Juan Baquera-Santoyo

M. S. Baquera-Luna

Alicia Luna-Flores

E. E. Lopez-Luna

Jose Antonio Jacobo Luna-Lopez

Melva Eliu Bravo-Morales

Cesar Jacobo Luna-Flores

Maria del Carmen Flores-Castillo

Rosario Luna-Flores

Respondents

L. Francis Cissna

Matthew Whitaker

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

James McHenry

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Ronald Donato Vitiello

U.S. Customs and Border Protection

Kirstjen M. Nielsen

Rodney C. Scott

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bernal Peter Ojeda

Attorney at Law Offices of Bernal Peter Ojeda

2945 Townsgate Road, Suite 200, Pob3064 The Westlake Park Place Office

Westlake Village, CA 91359-0664

Respondent Attorney

U S Attorney CV

Attorney at U S Attorneys Office Southern District of California

880 Front Street, Suite 6253

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Declaration

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by all Plaintiffs and filed by L. Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Rodney C. Scott, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Donato Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jms). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Exhibit List and Addendums & Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Hearing #2 by Cesar Jacobo Luna-Flores. (Ojeda, Bernal) docket text modified (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit Supporting Addendums & Exhibits

2 #2

Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2 #1

Statement of Facts Separate Statement of Facts

#2

(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by all Plaintiffs and by Cesar Jacobo Luna-Flores. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Separate Statement of Facts, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #3 Exhibit Supporting Addendums & Exhibits)(Ojeda, Bernal) (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

1 #6

Proof of Service

1 #5

Exhibit C-D

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Index of Exhibits and Addendums

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against L. Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Rodney C. Scott, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Donato Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0974-12198673.), filed by Rosario Luna-Flores, M. S. Baquera-Luna, Melva Eliu Bravo-Morales, Alicia Luna-Flores, Cesar Jacobo Luna-Flores, E. E. Lopez-Luna, Jose Antonio Jacobo Luna-Lopez, E.G. Luna-Bravo, C. Lopez-Luna, Juan Baquera-Santoyo, Maria del Carmen Flores-Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits and Addendums, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C-D, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-316-JM-BLM. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Ojeda, Bernal)Civil Cover Sheet replaced with one made by attorney (jms). (sjt). (Entered: 02/14/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by all Plaintiffs and filed by L. Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Rodney C. Scott, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Donato Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jms). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Exhibit List and Addendums & Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Hearing #2 by Cesar Jacobo Luna-Flores. (Ojeda, Bernal) docket text modified (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by all Plaintiffs and by Cesar Jacobo Luna-Flores. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Separate Statement of Facts, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #3 Exhibit Supporting Addendums & Exhibits)(Ojeda, Bernal) (jms). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against L. Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Rodney C. Scott, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald Donato Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0974-12198673.), filed by Rosario Luna-Flores, M. S. Baquera-Luna, Melva Eliu Bravo-Morales, Alicia Luna-Flores, Cesar Jacobo Luna-Flores, E. E. Lopez-Luna, Jose Antonio Jacobo Luna-Lopez, E.G. Luna-Bravo, C. Lopez-Luna, Juan Baquera-Santoyo, Maria del Carmen Flores-Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits and Addendums, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C-D, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-316-JM-BLM. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Ojeda, Bernal)Civil Cover Sheet replaced with one made by attorney (jms). (sjt). (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Customs and Border Protection is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer U S Attorney CV