This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2020 at 07:43:10 (UTC).

LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC v. IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA D. WOLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04399

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSHUA D. WOLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC

Defendants

IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC.

IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES, LLC

IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOUIS M. HEIDELBERGER

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL J. BONELLA

JOSEPH R. KLINICKI

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT DEFENDANT'S NAME IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CHANGE DEFENDANT'S NAME ON THE COURT'S CAPTION TO "IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES, LLC.". SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/22/2020.10/22/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Name In Caption and Docket filed by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BONELLA on behalf of IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BONELLA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. KLINICKI on behalf of IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KLINICKI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC PATENT OFFICE REPORT OF FILING RE PATENT (HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/9/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC SUMMONS (HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC.(HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

1 #4

Designation Form

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14549740.), filed by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/9/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT DEFENDANT'S NAME IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CHANGE DEFENDANT'S NAME ON THE COURT'S CAPTION TO "IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES, LLC.". SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 10/22/2020.10/22/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant's Name In Caption and Docket filed by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BONELLA on behalf of IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BONELLA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. KLINICKI on behalf of IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KLINICKI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC. IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPAPER #4 MAILED TO PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE (JL ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/9/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC PATENT OFFICE REPORT OF FILING RE PATENT (HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/9/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC SUMMONS (HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC.(HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC. (lisad, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against IKEA NORTH AMERICAN SERVICES LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14549740.), filed by LUMITECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(HEIDELBERGER, LOUIS) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/9/2020) (lisad, ). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less