This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2021 at 15:30:08 (UTC).

Lumintec, LLC v. Motorola Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Lumintec, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Motorola Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00402

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lumintec, LLC

Defendant

Motorola Mobility LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis E. Hudnell, III

Attorney at Hudnell Law Group P.C.

800 W. El Camino Real, Suite 180

Mountain View, CA 94040

 

Court Documents

#6

5 #5

Exhibit 5

5 #4

Exhibit 4

5 #3

Exhibit 3

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

4 #2

Exhibit 2

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Errata by Lumintec, LLC re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTACHMENT to #1 Complaint by Lumintec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lumintec, LLC. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14733818). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Lumintec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudnell, Lewis) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis Emery Hudnell, III