Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2020 at 08:24:26 (UTC).

Luman et al v. Balbach Transport, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Luman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Balbach Transport, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory B. Wormuth and Carmen E. Garza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00200

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

Referral Judge

Carmen E. Garza

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Kenneth Luman

Tonya Luman

Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Defendants and Counter Claimants

Balbach Transport, Inc.

Luis Trejo

Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants, 3Rd Party Defendants and Counter Claimants

Kenneth Luman

Luis Trejo

Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Stuart Ryan White

Attorney at Liles White PLLC

500 N. Water Street, Suite 800

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

David J Jaramillo

Attorney at Jaramillo Law Firm PC

505 Roma Ave Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Raul P Sedillo

Attorney at Butt, Thornton & Baehr, PC

P.O. Box 3170

Albuquerque, NM 87190

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Lauren Wilber

Attorney at Civerolo Gralow & Hill PA

Po Box 887

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Lance Dean Richards

Attorney at Civerolo, Gralow & Hill, P.A.

Po Drawer 887

Albuquerque, NM 87103-0887

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 5/26/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 6/2/2020 at 02:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garzas AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/27/2020. (ag) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Balbach Transport, Inc.. (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Trejo. Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Fine, David) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Raul P Sedillo on behalf of Kenneth Luman (Sedillo, Raul) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#9

(#9) Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Kenneth Luman's ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, for Negligence and Negligence Per Se Against Kenneth Luman and Third Party Complaint for Negligence Against Counter-Defendant (SIC) Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. DBA R+L Carriers by Kenneth Luman.(Sedillo, Raul) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Balbach Transport against Kenneth Luman, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM Balbach Transport against Kenneth Luman, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. by Balbach Transport, Inc.. (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#5

(#5) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Coversheet by Balbach Transport, Inc., Luis Trejo (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Balbach Transport, Inc., Luis Trejo identifying Corporate Parent Balbach Transport, Inc. for Balbach Transport, Inc.. (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Balbach Transport, Inc., Luis Trejo (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of All Defendants (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Santa Fe County District, case number D-101-CV-2019-03096. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Balbach Transport, Inc.. (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Trejo. Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Fine, David) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Balbach Transport, Inc., Luis Trejo. (jg) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 5/26/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 6/2/2020 at 02:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garzas AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/27/2020. (ag) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Raul P Sedillo on behalf of Kenneth Luman (Sedillo, Raul) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Kenneth Luman's ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, for Negligence and Negligence Per Se Against Kenneth Luman and Third Party Complaint for Negligence Against Counter-Defendant (SIC) Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. DBA R+L Carriers by Kenneth Luman.(Sedillo, Raul) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Luis Trejo, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Luis Trejo against Kenneth Luman, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., Luis Trejo, COUNTERCLAIM Luis Trejo against Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., Kenneth Luman by Luis Trejo. (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Balbach Transport against Kenneth Luman, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM Balbach Transport against Kenneth Luman, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. by Balbach Transport, Inc.. (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-7008611 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Balbach Transport, Inc., Luis Trejo (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Coversheet by Balbach Transport, Inc., Luis Trejo (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Balbach Transport, Inc., Luis Trejo identifying Corporate Parent Balbach Transport, Inc. for Balbach Transport, Inc.. (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Balbach Transport, Inc., Luis Trejo (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of All Defendants (Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Santa Fe County District, case number D-101-CV-2019-03096. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Richards, Lance) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., dba R+L Carriers is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Wilber