This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 07:23:26 (UTC).

Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc. v. Cavalier Closeouts Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Cavalier Closeouts Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dean D. Pregerson and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07056

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dean D. Pregerson

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

lululemon athletica canada, inc.

Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc.

Defendants

Eyal Allen Dahan

Cavalier Closeouts Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary J Alinder

Attorney at Sideman and Bancroft LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Anna P Chang

Attorney at Sideman and Bancroft LLP

One Embarcadero Center 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3711

Erica Brand Portnoy

Attorney at Sideman and Bancroft LLP

One Embarcadero Center 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3711

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting #13 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#15

(#15) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. (See minutes for further details) (yl) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc..(Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#13

(#13) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Defendant Eyal Allen Dahan. (shb) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07056 DDP(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: first page of filing was efiled with previoius active electronic headers intact, thus making current page 1 of both filings illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc., upon Defendant Eyal Allen Dahan served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eyal Allen Dahan, an individual, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc., upon Defendant Cavalier Closeouts Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eyal Allen Dahan, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cavalier Closeouts Inc., Eyal Allen Dahan. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by lululemon athletica canada, inc.. (Chang, Anna) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff lululemon athletica canada, inc.. (Portnoy, Erica) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff lululemon athletica canada, inc., identifying lululemon athletica, inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff lululemon athletica canada, inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24256475 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff lululemon athletica canada, inc.. (Attorney Zachary J Alinder added to party lululemon athletica canada, inc.(pty:pla))(Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting #13 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. (See minutes for further details) (yl) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc..(Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Defendant Eyal Allen Dahan. (shb) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07056 DDP(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: first page of filing was efiled with previoius active electronic headers intact, thus making current page 1 of both filings illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc., upon Defendant Eyal Allen Dahan served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eyal Allen Dahan, an individual, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc., upon Defendant Cavalier Closeouts Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eyal Allen Dahan, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Cavalier Closeouts Inc., Eyal Allen Dahan. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by lululemon athletica canada, inc.. (Chang, Anna) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff lululemon athletica canada, inc.. (Portnoy, Erica) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff lululemon athletica canada, inc., identifying lululemon athletica, inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff lululemon athletica canada, inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24256475 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff lululemon athletica canada, inc.. (Attorney Zachary J Alinder added to party lululemon athletica canada, inc.(pty:pla))(Alinder, Zachary) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA APPAREL LIQUIDATORS is a litigant

Latest cases where Lululemon Athletica Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anna P Chang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary J. Alinder Esquire