This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2021 at 08:17:00 (UTC).

LULAC Texas et al v. Esparza et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 LULAC Texas filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Esparza. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert Pitman and Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00786

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Robert Pitman

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lulac Texas

Vote Latino

Texas Alliance for Retired Americans

Texas AFT

Defendants

Jose Esparza

Ken Paxton

Jacquelyn Callanen

Dana DeBeauvoir

Isabel Longoria

Yvonne Ramon

Michael Scarpello

Lisa Wise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Russell Hardin

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3300

Dallas, TX 75201

Domingo A. Garcia

Attorney at The Law Offices of Domingo A. Garcia, P.C.

1111 W. Mockingbird Lane, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75247

Jonathan Patrick Hawley

Attorney at Elias Law Group LLP

1700 Seventh Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98101

Joseph N. Posimato

Attorney at Elias Law Group LLP

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Kathryn E. Yukevich

Attorney at Elias Law Group LLP

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Marc Erik Elias

Attorney at Elias Law Group LLP

10 G St. Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Meaghan E. Mixon

Attorney at Elias Law Group LLP

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Uzoma N. Nkwonta

Attorney at Elias Law Group LLP

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant Attorneys

Eric A. Hudson

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

Jeffrey Michael White

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 12548, Mc-009

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Leif A. Olson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Texas

Po Box 12548, Capitol Station Mc019

Austin, TX 78711

Patrick K. Sweeten

Attorney at Texas Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Mc 009

Austin, TX 78711

William Thomas Thompson

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 12548 (Mc-009)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Sameer Singh Birring

Attorney at Harris County Attorney's Office

1019 Congress, 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Barbara S. Nicholas

Attorney at Assistant District Attorney

Civil Division Administration Building, 5Th Floor

500 Elm Street, SUIT 6300

Ben L Stool

Attorney at Criminal District Attorney's Office of Dallas County, T

500 Elm Street, Suite 6300

Dallas, TX 75202

Earl S. Nesbitt

Attorney at Assistant District Attorney - Civil Division

500 Elm Street, Suite 6300

Dallas, TX 75202

Angelica Lien Leo

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Beatriz Mejia

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Christine Sun

Attorney at States United Democracy Center

3749 Buchanan St. No. 475165

San Francisco, CA 94147

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (dm) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#38

(#38) ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Consolidate these cases is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that all future filings be filed in La Unin del Pueblo Entero v. Abbott, No. 5:21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (dm) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

37 #1

Proposed Order proposed order granting motion for extension of time

#37

(#37) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Michael Scarpello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order granting motion for extension of time)(Stool, Ben) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#36

(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino, LULAC Texas, Texas AFT. Isabel Longoria served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Hardin, John) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

35 #1

Proposed Order

#35

(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Isabel Longoria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Birring, Sameer) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#34

(#34) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Domingo A. Garcia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100040370) by LULAC Texas. (dm) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

33 #1

Proposed Order Setting Deadline for Responsive Pleading

#33

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (dm) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Consolidate these cases is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that all future filings be filed in La Unin del Pueblo Entero v. Abbott, No. 5:21-cv-844 (W.D. Tex.). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (dm) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Isabel Longoria answer due 10/25/2021; Michael Scarpello answer due 10/25/2021. (dm) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant Michael Scarpello, in his official capacity as the Dallas County Elections Administrator, to Answer or otherwise plead is extended to October 25, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JA3) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Michael Scarpello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order granting motion for extension of time)(Stool, Ben) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino, LULAC Texas, Texas AFT. Isabel Longoria served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Hardin, John) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted permission to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldox) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant Isabel Longoria, in her official capacity as the Harris County Elections Administrator to Answer or otherwise plead is extended to October 25, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldox) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Isabel Longoria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Birring, Sameer) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Domingo A. Garcia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100040370) by LULAC Texas. (dm) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Partially-Opposed Motion to Consolidate in Case No. 5:21-cv-844 by Jose Esparza, Ken Paxton (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Sweeten, Patrick) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Lisa Wise. (dm) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lulac Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Hardin, John) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Jacquelyn Callanen, Dana DeBeauvoir, Jose Esparza, Isabel Longoria, Ken Paxton, Yvonne Ramon, Michael Scarpello, Lisa Wise. (dm) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lulac Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Hardin, John) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lulac Texas, Texas AFT, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, Vote Latino. (Hardin, John) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Marc E. Elias, Uzoma N. Nkwonta, Kathryn E. Yukevich, Joseph Posimato, Meghan E. Mixon and Jonathan P. Hawley. (dl) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15192824). No Summons requested at this time, filed by TEXAS ALLIANCE FOR RETIRED AMERICANS, VOTO LATINO, LULAC TEXAS, TEXAS AFT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, John) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara S Nicholas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Michael White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Alan Hudson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sameer Singh Birring