This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/02/2020 at 08:26:24 (UTC).

Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC v. Shell Trading (US) Company

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Shell Trading US Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02783

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC

Defendant

Shell Trading (US) Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward John Carlson

Attorney at Law Office of Edward Carlson

43 West 43Rd St, Suite 243

New York, NY 10036-7424

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Shell Trading (US) Company. Document filed by Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Carlson, Edward) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Edward John Carlson to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shell Trading (US) Company..(pc) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shell Trading (US) Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC..(Carlson, Edward) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC..(Carlson, Edward) Modified on 4/24/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carlson, Edward) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Edward John Carlson. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Shell Trading (US) Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19327833)Document filed by Lukoil Pan Americas, LLC..(Carlson, Edward) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELL TRADING (US) COMPANY., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward John Carlson