This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 15:36:34 (UTC).

Luke v. Kijakazi

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Luke filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Kijakazi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Luke

Defendant

Kilolo Kijakazi

Not Classified By Court

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George C Piemonte

Attorney at Martin, Jones, & Piemonte

123 N. Mcdonough St.

Decatur, GA 30030

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Statement Regarding Assignment of Case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Order upon Defendant, the Attorney General of the United States, and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia without prepayment of cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/9/2022. (csr) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • Docket(#11) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to the case. (JH) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #2 Order re Magistrate Assignment. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 10/6/2022. (thb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2022: #1 Consent Statement) (thb). Modified on 9/22/2022 (thb). (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (csr) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Order upon Defendant, the Attorney General of the United States, and the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia without prepayment of cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/9/2022. (csr) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Submitted. (gmh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Luke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (gmh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to David Luke and Kilolo Kijakazi. Plaintiff's Statement Re Assignment Due on 9/22/2022. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Statement Regarding Assignment of Case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge) (gmh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by David Luke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gmh) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George C. Piemonte