This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2022 at 07:49:46 (UTC).

Barbara Lynn Lujan v. Charter Communications, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Barbara Lynn Lujan filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Charter Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07399

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Lynn Lujan

Defendants

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

SPECTRUM

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS

TIME WARNER CABLE

Charter Communications, LLC

Charter Communications, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Charter Communications (CCI), Inc.

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kasra Brendon Ramez

Attorney at Law Office of Payab and Associates

5850 Canoga Avenue Suite 400

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

David Payab

Attorney at Law Office of Payab and Associates

5850 Canoga Avenue Suite 400

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Victoria V Felder

Attorney at Law Office of Payab and Associates

5850 Canoga Avenue Suite 400

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

John L Viola

Attorney at Thompson Coburn

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Keith Joseph Rasher

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV28633 Receipt No: ACACDC-34132186 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.(a Delaware Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Answer) (Attorney John L Viola added to party CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney John L Viola added to party CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,(pty:dft))(Viola, John) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B- Answer

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC., CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.(a Delaware Corporation), CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,, identifying Charter Communications, LLC; Charter Communications, Inc. dba Charter Communications (CCI), Inc.; Barbara Lynn Lujan, Plaintiff. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC., CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, identifying Charter Communications, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on October 13, 2022. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (kmh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#10

(#10) by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (kmh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on October 13, 2022. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#12

(#12) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Barbara Lynn Lujan.. (Ramez, Kasra) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending and Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration filed by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Viola, John) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION AND SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION #13 by Judge R. Gary Klausner are follows: This action will be and is hereby stayed pending the resolution of the arbitration proceedings; The scheduling conference on 22/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m. hereby is taken off-calendar. This action be removed from the active caseload without prejudice to reopening the matter to enforce the arbitration. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (See Order for further specifics). (jp) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending and Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration filed by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Viola, John) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Barbara Lynn Lujan.. (Ramez, Kasra) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on October 13, 2022. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (kmh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (kmh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on October 13, 2022. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/10/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Charter Communications, Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC, Does, Spectrum, Time Warner Cable. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Barbara Lynn Lujan. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/01/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC., CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, identifying Charter Communications, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.(a Delaware Corporation), CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,, identifying Charter Communications, LLC; Charter Communications, Inc. dba Charter Communications (CCI), Inc.; Barbara Lynn Lujan, Plaintiff. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC., CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,. (Viola, John) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV28633 Receipt No: ACACDC-34132186 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.(a Delaware Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Answer) (Attorney John L Viola added to party CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney John L Viola added to party CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC,(pty:dft))(Viola, John) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRUM is a litigant

Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L Viola