This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:41:40 (UTC).

LUIS v. VMSB, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 LUIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VMSB, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-22958

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROLANDO LUIS

Defendant

VMSB, LLC doing business as CASA CASUARINA doing business as GIANNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zandro E. Palma

Attorney at Zandro E. Palma, P.A.

9100 South Dadeland Boulevard, Suite 1500

Miami, FL 33156

Defendant Attorney

Eric Robert Thompson

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

100 Se 2Nd Street, Suite 3900

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Defendant's Answer to First Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Unopposed Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint by VMSB, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Eric) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROLANDO LUIS, filed by ROLANDO LUIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by VMSB, LLC. Attorney Eric Robert Thompson added to party VMSB, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Eric) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to VMSB, LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against VMSB, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13199604, filed by ROLANDO LUIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Defendant's Answer to First Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Unopposed Motion to Strike Portions of the First Amended Complaint by VMSB, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Eric) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROLANDO LUIS, filed by ROLANDO LUIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by VMSB, LLC. Attorney Eric Robert Thompson added to party VMSB, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Eric) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to VMSB, LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against VMSB, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13199604, filed by ROLANDO LUIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less