This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 07:59:05 (UTC).

Lugo v. Phoenix American Medical, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Lugo filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Phoenix American Medical, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James S. Moody, Jr and Thomas G. Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01001

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Felipe Lugo

Defendant

Phoenix American Medical, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda E. Heystek

Brandon J. Hill

Defendant Attorney

Laura E. Prather

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Phoenix American Medical, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19515959) filed by Felipe Lugo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/29/2022. (ABC) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Phoenix American Medical, LLC. (BD) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brandon J. Hill on behalf of Felipe Lugo. Lead Counsel: Brandon J. Hill. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Felipe Lugo. Related case(s): Yes (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Felipe Lugo. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#11

(#11) RETURN of service executed on May 27, 2022 by Felipe Lugo as to Phoenix American Medical, LLC. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Phoenix American Medical, LLC. (Prather, Laura) Modified on 6/17/2022 (SMB). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to July 1, 2022. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/17/2022. (SMB) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Phoenix American Medical, LLC. (Prather, Laura) Modified on 6/17/2022 (SMB). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN of service executed on May 27, 2022 by Felipe Lugo as to Phoenix American Medical, LLC. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Felipe Lugo. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Felipe Lugo. Related case(s): Yes (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brandon J. Hill on behalf of Felipe Lugo. Lead Counsel: Brandon J. Hill. (Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to Phoenix American Medical, LLC. (BD) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/29/2022. (ABC) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:22-cv-1001-JSM-TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Phoenix American Medical, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19515959) filed by Felipe Lugo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hill, Brandon) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less