This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:38:38 (UTC).

Lugar v. Red Gold, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Lugar filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Red Gold, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRYSTAL LUGAR

Defendants

RED GOLD, INC.

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa A Davidson

Attorney at Charles D Hankey Law Office PC

434 E New York St

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Defendant Attorneys

Craig R Patterson

Attorney at Beckman Lawson LLP

201 W Wayne St

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Douglas Dormire Powers

Attorney at Beckman Lawson LLP

201 W Wayne St

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Daniel K Ryan

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP - Chi/IL

151 N Franklin St Ste 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer J Kalas

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP - Sch/IN

322 Indianapolis Blvd Ste 201

Schererville, IN 46375

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 4/12/2022. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 10/12/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 7/12/2022; and from Defendants by 7/12/2022. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 7/12/2022; as to Defendants is 7/12/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 11/14/2022. To promote the speedy and just resolution of this matter, consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, and Local Rule 16-6(b), the parties are encouraged to engage in direct negotiations and/or alternative dispute resolution. To that end, the parties shall name a mediator no later than 4/12/2022 should the parties elect to proceed with mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 3/10/2022. (nhc) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Davidson, Melissa) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#14

(#14) Defendant Red Gold, Inc.,'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Red Gold, Inc..(Powers, Douglas) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#11

(#11) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Dormire Powers on behalf of Red Gold, Inc. (Powers, Douglas) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R Patterson on behalf of Red Gold, Inc. (Patterson, Craig) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#5

(#13) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #12 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED as MOOT. The deadline for Defendant, Life Insurance Company of North America to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint was extended to 3/10/2022 #5 . Text entry order. (mr) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J Kalas on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Davidson on behalf of Crystal Lugar (Davidson, Melissa) Modified on 1/13/2022 (jdb). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 4/12/2022. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 10/12/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 7/12/2022; and from Defendants by 7/12/2022. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 7/12/2022; as to Defendants is 7/12/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 11/14/2022. To promote the speedy and just resolution of this matter, consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, and Local Rule 16-6(b), the parties are encouraged to engage in direct negotiations and/or alternative dispute resolution. To that end, the parties shall name a mediator no later than 4/12/2022 should the parties elect to proceed with mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 3/10/2022. (nhc) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/10/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Melissa Davidson. Dfts appeared by attys Douglas Powers and Jennifer Kalas. The #15 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Parties are to file a notice with the Court by 4/12/2022 advising of their selection of a mediator should they elect to proceed with mediation. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/31/2022. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Davidson, Melissa) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant Red Gold, Inc.,'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Red Gold, Inc..(Powers, Douglas) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #12 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED as MOOT. The deadline for Defendant, Life Insurance Company of North America to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint was extended to 3/10/2022 #5 . Text entry order. (mr) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Dormire Powers on behalf of Red Gold, Inc. (Powers, Douglas) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Red Gold, Inc. ; answer due by March 3, 2022. (Patterson, Craig) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R Patterson on behalf of Red Gold, Inc. (Patterson, Craig) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines per #5 Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 3/10/22. (nal) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Ryan on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Life Insurance Company of North America ; answer due by 3/10/2022. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J Kalas on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, Red Gold, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (jdb) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Davidson on behalf of Crystal Lugar (Davidson, Melissa) Modified on 1/13/2022 (jdb). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, Red Gold, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4802932.), filed by Crystal Lugar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 **Atty Filed in Error** Proposed Summons)(Davidson, Melissa) Modified on 1/13/2022 (jdb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2022: #3 Corrected Proposed Summons) (jdb). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig R Patterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Dormire Powers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Jay Kalas